EP1129268 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE ADJUSTMENT OF TRANSLATIONALLY MOVED ADJUSTING DEVICES IN VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG, Coburg Ketschendorfer Strasse 38-50 96450 Coburg / DE | [2004/28] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG Coburg Ketschendorfer Strasse 38-50 96450 Coburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINRICH, Peter Hauptstrasse 68 D-98553 Hinternah / DE | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Ninnemann, Detlef, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Ninnemann, Detlef, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Kurfürstendamm 54-55 10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 99960918.3 | 12.11.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999DE03662 | Priority number, date | DE1998154038 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19854038 | [2001/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0029701 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1129268 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1129268 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/00, E05F15/16, B60J1/17 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
E05F15/41 (EP,US);
H02K11/215 (EP,US);
H02K11/22 (EP,US);
H02K11/38 (EP,US);
E05F15/695 (EP,US);
E05F15/697 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/474 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/499 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/33 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/336 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/54 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/55 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/58 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/454 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/21 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/40 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/73 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US);
H02K7/1166 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/28] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERFASSEN DER VERSTELLUNG TRANSLATORISCH BEWEGTER VERSTELLEINRICHTUNGEN IN FAHRZEUGEN | [2001/36] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE ADJUSTMENT OF TRANSLATIONALLY MOVED ADJUSTING DEVICES IN VEHICLES | [2001/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DETECTER LE REGLAGE DE DISPOSITIFS DE REGLAGE A DEPLACEMENT TRANSLATOIRE DANS DES VEHICULES | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 19.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.07.2004 | SE | 07.10.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2005/10] | SE | 07.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE4020351 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]DE19619932 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1* abstract * | by applicant | DE4020351 | DE19619932 |