EP1057371 - BALLAST FEEDBACK SCHEME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANCZAK, Jerzy Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HERNANDEZ, Adan, F. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Bosma, Rudolphus Hubertus Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Bosma, Rudolphus Hubertus Antonius Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99961036.3 | 01.12.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999EP09362 | Priority number, date | US19980216265 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: US 216265 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0038478 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1057371 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/00 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
H05B41/28 (EP,US);
Y10S315/05 (EP,US);
Y10S315/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/49] | Title | German: | RÜCKGEKOPPELTES VORSCHALTGERÄT | [2000/49] | English: | BALLAST FEEDBACK SCHEME | [2000/49] | French: | SCHEMA DE RETROINJECTION POUR BALLAST | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 30.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 05.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/02] | Request for further processing for: | 02.09.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.09.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]US5959408 (STEEL JOHN F [US], et al) [PX] 1-6 * column 3, line 50 - column 3, line 65; figure 1 *; | [A]US5500576 (RUSSELL RANDY G [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 7, line 4 - column 9, line 6; figure 4 *; | [A]WO9505059 (MOTOROLA LIGHTING INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * column W * |