EP1058544 - INHIBITION OF TNF ACTIVITY WITH COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HEPARIN AND SOLUBLE TNF RECPETORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/50] | INHIBITION OF TNF ACTIVITY | ||
[2004/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Research Systems ARS Holding N.V. Pietermaai 15 Curaçao / AN | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states Applied Research Systems ARS Holding N.V. Pietermaai 15 Curacao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADERKA, Dan Rechov Meridor 15 69411 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
ESHED (ENGLENDER), Talma Rechov Geva 6 53316 Givatayim / IL | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/50] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99961268.2 | 30.12.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999IL00709 | Priority number, date | IL19980127851 | 30.12.1998 Original published format: IL 12785198 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0040225 | Date: | 13.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058544 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058544 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61P43/00 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/727 (EP,US);
A61K38/1793 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1793, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/50] | A61K31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEMMUNG DER TNF-AKTIVITÄT MIT ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND HEPARIN UND LÖSLICHE TNF REZEPTOREN | [2004/27] | English: | INHIBITION OF TNF ACTIVITY WITH COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HEPARIN AND SOLUBLE TNF RECPETORS | [2004/27] | French: | INHIBITION DE L'ACTIVITE DU TNF AVEC DES COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES COMPRENANT DE L'HEPARINE ET LES RECEPTEURS SOLUBLES DU TNF | [2004/27] |
Former [2000/50] | HEMMUNG DER TNF-AKTIVITÄT | ||
Former [2000/50] | INHIBITION OF TNF ACTIVITY | ||
Former [2000/50] | INHIBITION DE L'ACTIVITE DU TNF | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 10.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0512528 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL]) [A] 2,3,6,7,9-11,14,15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 17 * * page 2, line 36 - line 55 * * page 3, line 3 - line 5 * * examples 1,2 * * claim - *; | [X]WO9219249 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,10,12-14,16 * abstract * * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 13 * * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 28 * * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 7 * * claims 1,2,7-13,18,20,22-24 *; | [A]WO9406476 (IMMUNEX CORP [US]) [A] 2,3,6,7,9-11,14,15 * abstract * * page 1, line 15 - line 17 * * page 2, line 3 - line 15 * * page 3, line 12 - line 25 * * page 5, line 12 - line 13 * * page 6, line 17 - line 18 * * example 4 * * page 23, line 29 - line 36 * * claims 1-5,8,9 *; | [A]WO9503827 (KENNEDY INST OF RHEUMATOLOGY [GB], et al) [A] 2,3,6,7,9-11,14,15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 27 * * page 4, line 28 - line 30 * * page 11, line 8 - line 17 * * examples 8,9 * * claims 13-24 * * figures 11,12 *; | [PX]WO9909051 (ORTHOGEN GENTECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 8-11,14,15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 ** claims 1,4,8 *; | [X] - BARAM D; RASHKOVSKY M; HERSHKOVIZ R; DRUCKER I; RESHEF T; BEN-SHITRIT S; MEKORI Y A, "Inhibitory effects of low molecular weight heparin on mediator release by mast cells: Preferential inhibition of cytokine production and mast cell-dependent cutaneous inflammation.", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, (199712), vol. 110, no. 3, pages 485 - 491, XP000913798 [X] 1,4,5,8,10,12-14,16 * abstract * * page 485, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 485, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 486, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 487, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 490, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2249.1997.4541471.x | [X] - IMIELA JACEK; NOSARZEWSKI JERZY; GORSKI ANDRZEJ, "Oral heparin in the treatment of rheumatoid arthritis.", ARCHIVUM IMMUNOLOGIAE ET THERAPIAE EXPERIMENTALIS, (1995), vol. 43, no. 5-6, pages 313 - 315, XP000913796 [X] 1,8,16 * abstract * * page 313, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 314, column 2, paragraph 2 * | [X] - KEPROS JOHN P; WANG PING; MORRISON MARY H; CHAUDRY IRSHAD H, "Mechanism of the beneficial effects of a novel nonanticoagulant heparin (GM1892) following hemorrhagic shock: Down-regulation of proinflammatory cytokine (TNF and IL-6) production.", SURGICAL FORUM, (1995), vol. 46, pages 87 - 89, XP000913789 [X] 1,8,16 * the whole document * | [X] - BRAZIER F; YZET T; DESSAINT C; DUCHMANN J C; PRIN L; DUPAS J L, "Effect of heparin on interleukin-6 and tumor necrosis factor alpha serum levels in inflammatory bowel diseases.", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1996), vol. 110, no. 4 SUPPL., page A871, XP000913780 [X] 1,8,16 * the whole document * | [X] - OLSSON I; GATANAGA T; GULLBERG U; LANTZ M; GRANGER G A, "Tumour necrosis factor (TNF) binding proteins (soluble TNF receptor forms) with possible roles in inflammation and malignancy.", EUROPEAN CYTOKINE NETWORK, (1993), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 169 - 180, XP000914174 [X] 1-3,6,8-11,15,16 * abstract * * page 170, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 171, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 173, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 174, column 2, paragraph 2 * * figure 3 * * page 175, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 175, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 176, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 177, column 2, paragraph 2 * | [A] - ADERKA DAN, "The potential biological and clinical significance of the soluble tumor necrosis factor receptors.", CYTOKINE & GROWTH FACTOR REVIEWS, (1996), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 231 - 240, XP000913779 [A] 2,3,6,7,9-11,14,15 * abstract * * page 231, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 231, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 232, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 232, column 2, paragraph 5 - page 233, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 234, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 235, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 236, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 236, column 2, paragraph 3 * * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6101(96)00026-3 |