EP1147469 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONCURRENT DBMS TABLE OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Computer Associates Think, Inc. One Computer Associates Plaza Islandia, New York 11749 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states Computer Associates Think, Inc. 1 Computer Associates Plaza Islandia, New York 11749 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIRZADEH, Rosita 22142 Archwood Street Woodland Hills, California 91303 / US | [2002/01] |
Former [2001/43] | 01 /
MIRZADEH, Rosita 18440 Hatteras Street 37 Tarzana, CA 91356 / US | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/39] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/43] | Whitten, George Alan R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99961787.1 | 24.11.1999 | [2001/43] | WO1999US27835 | Priority number, date | US19980200254 | 25.11.1998 Original published format: US 200254 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0031635 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1147469 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1147469 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F12/00, G06F17/30 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
G06F16/284 (EP,US);
G06F9/46 (KR);
Y10S707/99938 (US);
Y10S707/99942 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON PARALLELEN OPERATIONEN IN EINER TABELLE EINES RELATIONALEN DATENVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2001/43] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONCURRENT DBMS TABLE OPERATIONS | [2001/43] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'OPERATIONS PARALLELES DE TABLES SGBD | [2001/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 01.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.09.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 27.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 30.11.2006 | Appeal received No. T0353/07 | 30.01.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.10.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 28.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2004 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.2011 | BE | 19.10.2011 | CY | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | IT | 19.10.2011 | NL | 19.10.2011 | SE | 19.10.2011 | IE | 24.11.2011 | LU | 24.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | FR | 19.12.2011 | GB | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | ES | 30.01.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | [2013/29] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 24.11.2011 | ||
LU | 24.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 19.12.2011 | ||
GB | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 24.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 19.12.2011 | ||
GB | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 24.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 19.12.2011 | ||
GB | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 24.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GB | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 24.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GB | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GB | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/29] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 19.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5758357 (BARRY RICHARD E [US], et al) [A] 1-34* column 2, line 51 - column 5, line 30 *; | [Y] - ORACLE, "Oracle 8:Parallel Data Manipulation", ORACLE TECHNICAL WHITE PAPER, (199706), URL: http://otn.oracle.com/products/oracle8/htdocs/xpdmtwp3.htm, (20030407), XP002238157 [Y] 1-34 * the whole document * | [Y] - M.L. POWELL, S.R. KLEIMAN, S. BARTON, D. SHAH, D. STEIN, M. WEEKS, "SunOS Multithread Architecture", SUN MICROSYSTEMS USENIX, (1991), URL: http://citeseer.nj.nec.com/cache/papers/cs/7133/http:zSzzSzwww.ee.umd.eduzSzcourseszSzenee647zSzthreadszSzmulti-thread.pdf/powell91sunos.pdf, (20030407), XP002238158 [Y] 1-34 * the whole document * | [A] - "Oracle8:The hub of Oracle Warehouse", ORACLE TECHNICAL WHITE PAPER, (199706), URL: http://otn.oracle.com/products/oracle8/htdocs/xdwtwphb.htm, (20030407), XP002238159 [A] 1-34 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5437032 (WOLF JOEL L [US], et al); | [X]US5754771 (EPPERSON DIRK [US], et al); | [AP]US5860070 (TOW DANIEL S [US], et al); | [AP]US5884310 (BRICHTA HARRIET B [US], et al) |