EP1144065 - APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING CRYSTALLINE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Change - refusal | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANCASTER, Robert, William Glaxo Wellcome plc, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 02 /
SINGH, Hardev Glaxo Wellcome plc, Temple Hill Dartford, Kent DA1 5AH / GB | 03 /
THEOPHILUS, Andrew, Lewis Glaxo Wellcome plc,Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Giddings, Peter John, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Giddings, Peter John, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2001/42] | Giddings, Peter John, Dr., et al GlaxoSmithKline, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99962413.3 | 22.12.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999GB04368 | Priority number, date | GB19980028721 | 24.12.1998 Original published format: GB 9828721 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0038811 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144065 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D9/00, B01J19/10, A61K9/14 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
B01J2/02 (EP,US);
B01D9/00 (KR);
A61K9/14 (KR);
A61K9/1688 (EP,US);
B01D9/005 (EP,US);
B01D9/0054 (EP,US);
B01D9/0059 (EP,US);
B01F23/4111 (EP,US);
B01F31/85 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | SI | 20.06.2001 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU HERSTELLUNG KRITALLINER PARTIKEL | [2001/42] | English: | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING CRYSTALLINE PARTICLES | [2001/42] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE PARTICULES CRISTALLINES | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2003 | Observations by third parties | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2007 | Observations by third parties | 04.12.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 04.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/23] | 21.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/09] | 31.01.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/23] | Request for further processing for: | 24.04.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 24.04.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.05.2006 | Decision despatched | 10.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.11.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2504347 (DSO PHARMACHIM) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [A]WO9003782 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [A] 1-26 * figure 1; claim - *; | [X]WO9632095 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-26 * claim - *; | [A]WO9833782 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * figures 1,2; claim - * | other | DE1262240 | - MARTIN P., "Sonochemistry and Sonoprocessing at Industrial Scale", THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE SCALE-UP OF CHEMICAL PROCESS, JERSEY, CHANNEL ISLANDS, (19980921), pages 379 - 412, XP002968611 |