EP1150990 - ERYTHROMYCIN A COMPOUNDS AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HANMI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 893-5, Jaju-ri, Paltan-myum, Hwasung-gun Kyunggi-do 445-910 / KR | [2001/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUH, Kwee-Hyun Daewoo 2nd Apt. 205-1301, 244-3, Geungpo-dong Yichung-shi Kyunggi-do 467-110 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Nam-Du 202, 532-1, Soochung-dong Osan-shi Kyunggi-do 447-290 / KR | 03 /
PAE, Hyoung-Jun Kwanak-Town Apt. 127-504, 1102, Booheung-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-shi Kyunggi-do 431-054 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Gwan-Sun Geukdong Apt. 2-806, Garak-dong Songpa-gu, Seoul 138-160 / KR | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Ricker, Mathias, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg- Geissler & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/45] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99962529.6 | 27.12.1999 | [2001/45] | WO1999KR00824 | Priority number, date | KR19980060263 | 29.12.1998 Original published format: KR 9860263 | [2001/45] | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0039142 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1150990 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.07.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/08 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/45] | Title | German: | ERYTHROMYCIN A-DERIVATE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2001/45] | English: | ERYTHROMYCIN A COMPOUNDS AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME | [2001/45] | French: | COMPOSES D'ERYTHROMYCINE A ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ASSOCIE | [2001/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1999 | Translation filed | 24.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 24.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 29.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/51] | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0158467 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-12 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 13 *; | [AD]WO9736913 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - BRANDT-RAUF P ET AL, "FLUORESCENT ASSAY FOR ESTIMATING THE BINDING OF ERYTHROMYCIN DERIVATIVES TO RIBOSOMES", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (197807), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 88 - 94, XP000923144 [A] 10-12 * the whole document * * " in particular the dimeric compounds 58, 64 and 66 * | International search | [A]EP0260938 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH0276893 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD); | [A]JPS6281399 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD); | [A]JPS6287599 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD) |