EP1141791 - SYSTEMS FOR GENERATING AND USING A LOOKUP TABLE WITH PROCESS FACILITY CONTROL SYSTEMS AND MODELS OF THE SAME, AND METHODS OF OPERATING SUCH SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Z., Joseph 19513 N. 73rd Lane Glendale, AZ 85308 / US | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99962834.0 | 22.11.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999US27726 | Priority number, date | US19980224439 | 31.12.1998 Original published format: US 224439 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0041045 | Date: | 13.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1141791 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1141791 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/04 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
G05B13/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR GENERIERUNG UND VERWENDUNG EINER NACHSCHLAGETABELLE IN STEUERUNGSSYSTEMEN UND MODELLEN EINER BEARBEITUNGSANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN SOLCHER SYSTEME | [2001/41] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR GENERATING AND USING A LOOKUP TABLE WITH PROCESS FACILITY CONTROL SYSTEMS AND MODELS OF THE SAME, AND METHODS OF OPERATING SUCH SYSTEMS | [2001/41] | French: | SYSTEMES DE GENERATION ET D'UTILISATION D'UNE TABLE DE CONSULTATION AVEC SYSTEMES DE COMMANDE D'INSTALLATIONS DE PROCESSUS ET MODELES CORRESPONDANTS, ET PROCEDES DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE CES SYSTEMES | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 12.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5463555 (WARD DENNIS M [CA], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 13, line 64 - column 33, line 15; figures 2-11 *; | [A]EP0756219 (WORTBERG JOHANNES PROF DR [DE], et al) [A] 1,12,20* abstract *; | [AD]WO9850832 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [AD] 1,12,20 * abstract * |