EP1145342 - HIGH RATE ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL AND ASSEMBLY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, FR, IT, LI | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVEREADY BATTERY COMPANY, INC. 25225 Detroit Road, P O Box 450777 Westlake Ohio 44145-0616 / US | [2009/11] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Eveready Battery Company, Inc. 25225 Detroit Road, P O Box 450777 Westlake, Ohio 44145-0616 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GETZ, Dale, R. 24047 Beaumont Drive North Olmsted OH 44070 / US | [2002/01] |
Former [2001/42] | 01 /
GETZ, Dale, R. 1650 Balmoral Way Westlake, OH 44145 / US | Representative(s) | Fairbairn, Angus Chisholm Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Fairbairn, Angus Chisholm Marks & Clerk 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields GB-London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99962874.6 | 24.11.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999US28027 | Priority number, date | US19980198802 | 24.11.1998 Original published format: US 198802 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0033397 | Date: | 08.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1145342 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1145342 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/08, H01M4/72, H01M6/10 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
H01M6/103 (EP,US);
H01M4/72 (EP,US);
H01M6/08 (EP,US);
H01M6/10 (EP,US);
H01M2006/5094 (EP,US);
H01M4/0473 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/42] | H01M2/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ZELLE MIT HOHEM DURCHSATZ UND ANSAMMLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2001/42] | English: | HIGH RATE ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL AND ASSEMBLY METHOD | [2001/42] | French: | ELEMENT ELECTROCHIMIQUE A FORT DEBIT ET SON PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE | [2001/42] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2001/42: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2001/42: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2001/42: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 26.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | FR | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/06] | NL | 11.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3335031 (KORDESCH KARL V) [X] 1,2,12,13 * figure 1; claims 1-7 * [A] 7,11; | [X]US3490951 (GEORGE PERCY G) [X] 1,2,8-10,12-14 * figures 1,2; claims 1-6 *; | [X]US4042756 (GOEBEL FRANZ, et al) [X] 1,2,8-10,12-14 * figures 1,2; claims 1-17 *; | [A]US5486433 (GLASER HELMUT F [SG]) [A] 3-6,15-28* claims 1-19 *; | [PX]US5869205 (MICK ALVIN R [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,8,9,12,13 * figure 1; claims 1-25 * |