EP1135144 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REGULATING BACTERIAL PATHOGENESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRINCETON UNIVERSITY Office of Technology & Trademark licensing New South Building 5th floor Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US | For all designated states University Technologies International 3553-31 Street NW, Suite 130 Calgary Alberta T2N 2A1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Princeton University Office of Technology & Trademark licensing,New South Building, 5th floor Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US | ||
For all designated states University Technologies International 3553-31 Street NW, Suite 130 Calgary, Alberta T2N 2A1 / CA | |||
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states Princeton University Office of Technology & Trademark licensing,New South Building, 5th floor Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASSLER, Bonnie, Princeton University New South Bld., 5th floor, P.O. Box 36 Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US | 02 /
Surette, Michael G. 58 Hawkwood Blvd N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2N 4N1 / CA | [2001/50] |
Former [2001/39] | 01 /
BASSLER, Bonnie, Princeton University New South Bld., 5th floor, P.O. Box 36 Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US | ||
02 /
Surette, Michael G. Calgary Alberta / CA | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 99963011.4 | 02.12.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999US28751 | Priority number, date | US19980110570P | 02.12.1998 Original published format: US 110570 P | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0032152 | Date: | 08.06.2000 | [2000/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1135144 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/106, C12N5/00, C12N5/02, G01N33/53, G01N33/566, G01N33/569 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K31/121 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/39] | A61K35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUR REGULATION DER BAKTERIELLEN PATHOGENESE | [2001/39] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REGULATING BACTERIAL PATHOGENESIS | [2001/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES DE REGULATION DE LA PATHOGENESE BACTERIENNE | [2001/39] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 10.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 08.07.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/35] | Request for further processing for: | 23.08.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.09.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - M. S. SURETTE ET AL, "Quorum sensing in Escherichia coli and Salmonella typhimurium", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, USA, (199806), vol. 95, pages 7046 - 7050, XP002318236 [X] 1,2,27 * abstract * * page 7049, column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.12.7046 | [A] - SURETTE M G ET AL, "Quorum sensing in escherichia coli, Salmonella typhimurium and vibrio harveyi: a new family of genes responsible for autoinducer production", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199102), vol. 96, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1639 - 1644, XP002968927 [A] 1,2,27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.4.1639 | [A] - HANZELKA B L ET AL, "QUORUM SENSING IN VIBRIO FISCHERI: EVIDENCE THAT S-ADENOSYLMETHIONINE IS THE AMINO ACID SUBSTRATE FOR AUTOINDUCER SYNTHESIS", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199609), vol. 178, no. 17, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 5291 - 5294, XP000857480 [A] 1,2,27 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5612184 (ROSSON REINHARDT A [US]); | [Y]US5658748 (MAEYRAE-MAEKINEN AN [FI], et al); | [Y]US5593827 (BYCROFT BARRIE W [GB], et al); | [Y] - EBERHARD ET AL., "Structural Identification of Autoinducer of Photobacterium Fisheri Luciferase", BIOCHEMISTRY., (1981), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 2444 - 2449, XP002923426 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00512a013 | [A] - MANCINI ET AL., "Cloning and Expression of the Photobacterium Phosphoreum Luminescence System Demonstrates a Unique Lux Gene Organization", J. OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., (19981005), vol. 263, no. 28, pages 14308 - 14314, XP002923427 | [Y] - MARTIN ET AL., "Identification of a Locus Controlling Expression of Luminescence Genes In Vibrio Harveyi", J. OF BACTERIOLOGY., (198905), vol. 171, no. 5, pages 2406 - 2414, XP002923428 | [Y] - SHOWALTER ET AL., "Cloning and Nucleotide Sequence of luxR, a Regulatory Gene Controlling Bioluminescence In Vibrio Harveyi", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY., (199006), vol. 172, no. 6, pages 2946 - 2954, XP002923429 | [Y] - BASSLER ET AL., "Multiple Signalling Systems Controlling Expression of Luminescence In Vibrio Harveyi; Sequence and Function of Genes Encoding A Second Sensory Pathway", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY., (1994), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 273 - 286, XP002913784 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2958.1994.tb00422.x |