EP1144285 - LOW PRESSURE DYNAMIC ACCUMULATION TABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Opposition rejected | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sidel Participations Avenue de la Patrouille de France 76930 Octeville Sur Mer / FR | [2007/22] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Gebo Conveyors Consultants & Systems Inc. 1043 Autoroute Chomedey Laval, Quebec H7W 4V3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETROVIC, Zmaj Apartment 2610, 4000 Boulevard de Maisonneuve Westmount, Quebec H3Z 1J9 / CA | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2001/42] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 8, Avenue Pierre Mendès France 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | Application number, filing date | 99963179.9 | 29.12.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999CA01245 | Priority number, date | CA19992259816 | 18.01.1999 Original published format: CA 2259816 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0041955 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144285 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144285 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/51, B65G47/71 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
B65G47/5118 (EP);
B65G47/71 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHER STAUTISCH MIT NIEDRIGER AUFPRALLKRAFT | [2001/42] | English: | LOW PRESSURE DYNAMIC ACCUMULATION TABLE | [2001/42] | French: | PLATEAU D'ACCUMULATION DYNAMIQUE BASSE PRESSION | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.04.2003
14.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Steinle Fördertechnik GmbH Breitenfeldstrasse 47 79341 Kenzingen / DE Opponent's representative Börjes-Pestalozza, Henrich Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | 02
03.04.2003
14.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE KRONES AG Boehmerwaldstr. 5 93068 Neutraubling / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | 03
10.05.2004
19.05.2004
INTERVENTION KHS AG Juchostrasse 20 44143 Dortmund / DE Opponent's representative Nunnenkamp, Jörg Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.04.2003
14.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Steinle Fördertechnik GmbH Breitenfeldstrasse 47 79341 Kenzingen / DE Opponent's representative Börjes-Pestalozza, Heinrich Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | ||
02
03.04.2003
14.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE KRONES AG Boehmerwaldstr. 5 93068 Neutraubling / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | |||
03
10.05.2004
19.05.2004
INTERVENTION KHS AG Juchostrasse 20 44143 Dortmund / DE Opponent's representative Nunnenkamp, Jörg Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Patentanwälte Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | |||
Former [2004/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.04.2003
14.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Steinle Fördertechnik GmbH Breitenfeldstrasse 47 79341 Kenzingen / DE Opponent's representative Börjes-Pestalozza, Heinrich Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | ||
02
03.04.2003
14.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE KRONES AG Boehmerwaldstr. 5 93068 Neutraubling / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | |||
03
10.05.2004
19.05.2004
INTERVENTION KHS Maschinen- und Anlagenbau AG Juchostr. 20 44143 Dortmund / DE Opponent's representative Nunnenkamp, Jörg, Dr. Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Patentanwälte Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | |||
Former [2004/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.04.2003
14.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Steinle Fördertechnik GmbH Breitenfeldstrasse 47 79341 Kenzingen / DE Opponent's representative Börjes-Pestalozza, Heinrich Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | ||
02
03.04.2003
14.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE KRONES AG Boehmerwaldstr. 5 93068 Neutraubling / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | |||
03
10.05.2004
KHS Maschinen- und Anlagenbau AG Juchostr. 20 44143 Dortmund / DE Opponent's representative Nunnenkamp, Jörg, Dr. Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Patentanwälte Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | |||
Former [2003/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.04.2003
14.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Steinle Fördertechnik GmbH Breitenfeldstrasse 47 79341 Kenzingen / DE Opponent's representative Börjes-Pestalozza, Heinrich Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | ||
02
03.04.2003
14.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE KRONES AG Boehmerwaldstr. 5 93068 Neutraubling / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | 09.05.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.09.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.05.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.05.2007 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.05.2008 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/30] | Appeal following opposition | 29.06.2007 | Appeal received No. T1077/07 | 20.09.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.05.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 03.07.2002 | FI | 03.07.2002 | LI | 03.07.2002 | SE | 03.10.2002 | CY | 31.12.2002 | MC | 31.12.2006 | [2008/18] |
Former [2005/21] | CH | 03.07.2002 | |
FI | 03.07.2002 | ||
LI | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | CH | 03.07.2002 | |
LI | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | CH | 03.07.2002 | |
LI | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 03.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5282525 (COVERT WILLIAM J [US]) [DA] 1-18 * column W *; | [A]US5501315 (LOOMER WESTON R [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 37; figure - *; | [A]US4361759 (KING GEORGE W, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 16 - column 2, line 39; figure - * | by applicant | US5282525 |