EP1140531 - OPERATING UNIT WHICH CAN BE ILLUMINATED AND WHICH IS PROVIDED FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEMPKEN, Ludger Im Weissen Tal 7 D-64331 Weiterstadt / DE | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/20] |
Former [2001/41] | Richter, Jürgen Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 99963448.8 | 09.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP09686 | Priority number, date | DE1998157980 | 16.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19857980 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0035691 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140531 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140531 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60Q3/04 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
B60H1/00 (KR);
B60H1/00428 (EP);
B60Q3/16 (EP);
Y02T10/88 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2002/38] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BELEUCHTBARE BEDIENEINHEIT EINER KRAFTFAHRZEUGKLIMAANLAGE | [2001/41] | English: | OPERATING UNIT WHICH CAN BE ILLUMINATED AND WHICH IS PROVIDED FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM | [2001/41] | French: | UNITE DE COMMANDE ECLAIRABLE D'UNE INSTALLATION DE CLIMATISATION DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.09.2002 | SE | 18.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/05] | SE | 18.12.2002 | |
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 18.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5455463 (LANGNICKEL WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [A]US4323895 (COSTE JEAN C) | [AD] - G. WALLISER, "BORDNETZ", ELEKTRONIK IM KRAFTFAHRZEUGWESEN, (1997), vol. 2, pages 661 - 663, XP000878951 [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | - WALLISER, GERHARD / RENNINGEN-MALSHEIM, Elektronik im Kraftfahrzeugwesen, vol. 2, pages 661 - 663 |