EP1140461 - CLEANING MATERIAL FOR EXTRUDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCH, Uwe Hauptstrasse 21 D-67229 Gerolsheim / DE | 02 /
KLENZ, Rainer Im Wachtelschlag 34 D-67454 Ha loch / DE | 03 /
FRIEL, PETER Kühnlestrasse 5 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | 04 /
GAREISS, Brigitte Am Zollstock 18 D-67271 Obersülzen / DE | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99963534.5 | 14.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP09932 | Priority number, date | DE19981058672 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19858672 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0037236 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140461 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140461 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1140461 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/08, // B29K77:00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
B29C48/27 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSMASSE FÜR EXTRUDER | [2001/41] | English: | CLEANING MATERIAL FOR EXTRUDERS | [2001/41] | French: | PRODUIT DE NETTOYAGE POUR EXTRUDEUSE | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 18.06.2003 | IE | 18.06.2003 | DK | 18.09.2003 | GR | 18.09.2003 | PT | 18.09.2003 | SE | 18.09.2003 | CY | 14.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/36] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
IE | 18.06.2003 | ||
DK | 18.09.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
CY | 14.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
IE | 18.06.2003 | ||
DK | 18.09.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
IE | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | GR | 18.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6347117 ; | [A]JPS5595545 ; | [A]JPS5593436 ; | [A]JPH04180964 ; | [A]JPH0260727 ; | [X]US3869525 (MILLER DONALD N) [X] 1,2,5,6 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP0333408 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 3,4 * claims 1-4 *; | [X]WO9517268 (FERRO CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * example D *; | [X]EP0800910 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 3, line 22 - line 34 * * page 4, line 30 - line 38; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9744395 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * examples 1-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880722), vol. 012, no. 262, Database accession no. (M - 721), & JP63047117 A 19880227 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800930), vol. 004, no. 139, Database accession no. (M - 034), & JP55095545 A 19800719 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800924), vol. 004, no. 136, Database accession no. (M - 033), & JP55093436 A 19800715 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921012), vol. 016, no. 490, Database accession no. (C - 0994), & JP04180964 A 19920629 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 3,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900516), vol. 014, no. 231, Database accession no. (M - 0974), & JP02060727 A 19900301 (MITSUBISHI KASEI CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |