EP1133283 - A METHOD OF PRODUCING DRUG PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2001/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOISSIER, Catherine AstraZeneca R&D Mölndal S-431 83 Mölndal / SE | 02 /
JUPPO, Anne, Mari AstraZeneca R&D Mölndal S-43183 Mölndal / SE | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Larsson, Birgitta, et al AstraZeneca AB Intellectual Property, Patents 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Larsson, Birgitta, et al AstraZeneca AB, Intellectual Property, Patents 151 85 Södertälje / SE | ||
Former [2001/38] | Nelson, Michael Andrew AstraZeneca Global Intellectual Property: Patents P.O. Box 272 - Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4GR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99963729.1 | 22.11.1999 | [2001/38] | WO1999SE02152 | Priority number, date | SE19980004003 | 23.11.1998 Original published format: SE 9804003 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0030612 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133283 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1133283 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K31/41, A61K31/44, A61K31/165 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
A61K9/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K9/1688 (EP,US);
B01D11/0411 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ARZNEISTOFFPARTIKELN | [2001/38] | English: | A METHOD OF PRODUCING DRUG PARTICLES | [2001/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PARTICULES MEDICAMENTEUSES | [2001/38] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 25.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9003782 (UPJOHN CO [US]); | [Y]WO9619198 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al); | [X]WO9714407 (RES TRIANGLE PHARM LTD [US], et al); | [A]WO9828294 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) |