EP1159220 - Package comprising a dispensing structure incorporating a valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/49] | A DISPENSING STRUCTURE INCORPORATING A VALVE-CONTAINING FITMENT FOR MOUNTING TO A CONTAINER AND A PACKAGE WITH A DISPENSING STRUCTURE | ||
[2006/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seaquist Closures Foreign, Inc. 475 West Terra Cotta Crystal Lake, Illinois 60014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Seaquist Closures Foreign, Inc 475 West Terra Cotta Crystal Lake, Illinois 60014 / US | ||
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Seaquist Closures Foreign, Inc 475 West Terra Cotta Crystal Lake Illinois 60014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESS, John, M., III 5105 Amberwood Ct. Midland, MI 48640 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Stuart, R. 4414 Trail Wood Circle South Midland, MI 48632 / US | 03 /
ROBINSON, Joel, R. 3547 Boy Scout Road Bay City, MI 48706 / US | 04 /
SOCIER, Timothy, R. 1700 Prairie Street Essexville, MI 48732 / US | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Appelt, Christian W., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/49] | Groening, Hans Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing., et al BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99963922.2 | 17.11.1999 | [2001/49] | WO1999US27300 | Priority number, date | US19980196301 | 19.11.1998 Original published format: US 196301 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0030969 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1159220 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159220 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.10.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/20, B65D75/58, B65D5/74 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
B65D75/5883 (EP,US);
B65D47/2031 (EP,US);
B65D5/746 (EP,US);
B65D75/008 (EP,US);
B65D75/5822 (EP,US);
B29C65/06 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/30223 (EP,US);
B29C66/53263 (EP,US);
B65D2575/583 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/49] | B67C7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verpackung mit einer ein Ventil aufweisenden Abgabevorrichtung | [2006/25] | English: | Package comprising a dispensing structure incorporating a valve | [2006/25] | French: | Emballage comportant une structure de distribution incorporant un clapet | [2006/25] |
Former [2001/49] | ABGABEVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER, EIN VENTIL AUFWEISENDEN ARMATUR, ZUM AUFSETZEN AUF EINEN BEHÄLTER UND VERPACKUNG MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2001/49] | A DISPENSING STRUCTURE INCORPORATING A VALVE-CONTAINING FITMENT FOR MOUNTING TO A CONTAINER AND A PACKAGE WITH A DISPENSING STRUCTURE | ||
Former [2001/49] | STRUCTURE DE DISTRIBUTION INCORPORANT UNE CLOISON CONTENANT UN CLAPET CON U POUR ETRE MONTE SUR UN RESERVOIR ET EMBALLAGE COMPORTANT CETTE STRUCTURE DE DISTRIBUTION | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 14.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5307955 (VIEGAS FLEMING [CA]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 10 - column 7, line 20; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,4,6-20,25-28; | [XY]US5377877 (BROWN PAUL E [US], et al) [X] 5 * column 9, line 27 - column 27, line 7; figures 1-34 * [Y] 11-28; | [Y]JPH05229566 ; | [Y]EP0763482 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 17-20,23,24 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9615978 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [Y] 12-16 * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 22; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]JPH05310266 ; | [Y]US3233817 (CASADY ALLEN W) [Y] 3,12-16,25-28 * column 3, line 44 - line 47; figures 1,3,4 *; | [Y]EP0276102 (METAL BOX PLC [GB]) [Y] 17-24 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 29; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US5637396 (SATO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,11,16,20,24 * column 6, line 27 - line 39; figures 8,9 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931214), vol. 017, no. 682, Database accession no. (M - 1528), & JP05229566 A 19930907 (ARUTETSUKU KK) [Y] 6-10 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940225), vol. 018, no. 119, Database accession no. (M - 1567), & JP05310266 A 19931122 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 3,12-16,25-28 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4732299 (HOYT EARL E [US]); | [Y]US4964562 (GORDON ROBERT L [US]); | [Y]US5193712 (KUEPPERSBUSCH GERD [DE]); | [Y]US5271531 (ROHR ROBERT D [US], et al) |