EP1135397 - METHOD FOR PREPARATION OF DISODIUM PAMIDRONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2010 | New entry: Request for decision: receipt of request | 12.05.2010 | New entry: Request for decision: result | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MGI OM, Inc. Corporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2008/23] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Aesgen, Inc. 2 Research Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | ||
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Aesgen, Inc. 2 Research Way Priceton, NJ 08540 / US | ||
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states Aesgen, Inc. P.O. Box 7275 Priceton, NJ 08543-7275 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINAL, Edward, C. 320 Pennington-Titusville rd. Pennington, NJ08534 / US | [2002/12] |
Former [2001/39] | 01 /
SHINAL, Edward, C. 10 Sherwood Court Holmdel, NJ 07733 / US | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99964198.8 | 10.12.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999US29284 | Priority number, date | US19980209153 | 10.12.1998 Original published format: US 209153 | US19990414401 | 07.10.1999 Original published format: US 414401 | US19990456460 | 08.12.1999 Original published format: US 456460 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0034293 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1135397 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1135397 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/38, A61K31/663, A61K47/26, A61K9/48, A61K9/12 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
A61K47/26 (EP);
A61K9/19 (EP);
C07F9/3873 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DINATRIUMPAMIDRONAT | [2001/39] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARATION OF DISODIUM PAMIDRONATE | [2001/39] | French: | METHODE DE PREPARATION DU PAMIDRONATE DE DISODIUM | [2002/27] |
Former [2001/39] | METHODE DE PREPARATION DU PAMIDRONATE | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 20.06.2001 | Observations by third parties | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2009 | Request for decision received: Various | 25.08.2009 | Request for decision received: division | 19.05.2010 | Result of request for decision (Various): Request rejected | 19.05.2010 | Result of request for decision (division): Request accepted | Divisional application(s) | EP02076885.9 / EP1228762 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.2004
04.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Willmar Schwabe GmbH & Co. KG Willmar-Schwabe-Str. 4 76227 Karlsruhe / DE Opponents representative Bunke, Holger, et al, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | 02
23.01.2004
04.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Lyogenerics Ltd. Suite B, 53 Lancaster Gate London W2 3NA / GB Opponents representative Tubby, David George Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | 03
23.01.2004
04.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE STADA Arzneimittel AG Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponents representative Hamm, Volker Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | 04
23.01.2004
09.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE COMBINO PHARM S.L. Fructuos Gelabert 6-8 08970 Sant Joan Despi, Barcelona / ES Opponents representative Polz, Leo, et al, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.2004
04.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Willmar Schwabe GmbH & Co. KG Willmar-Schwabe-Str. 4 76227 Karlsruhe / DE Opponents representative Bunke, Holger, Dr.rer.nat. Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
02
23.01.2004
04.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Lyogenerics Ltd. Suite B, 53 Lancaster Gate London W2 3NA / GB Opponents representative Tubby, David George MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | |||
03
23.01.2004
04.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE STADA Arzneimittel AG Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponents representative Hamm, Volker, Dr. Maiwald Patentanwalts-GmbH Ballindamm 37 20095 Hamburg / DE | |||
04
23.01.2004
09.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE COMBINO PHARM S.L. Fructuos Gelabert 6-8 08970 Sant Joan Despi, Barcelona / ES Opponents representative Polz, Leo, et al, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2004/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.2004
04.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Willmar Schwabe GmbH & Co. KG Willmar-Schwabe-Str. 4 76227 Karlsruhe / DE Opponents representative Bunke, Holger, Dr.rer.nat. Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
02
23.01.2004
04.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Lyogenerics Ltd. Suite B, 53 Lancaster Gate London W2 3NA / GB Opponents representative Tubby, David George (GB) Marks & Clerk 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields GB-London WC2A 3LS / GB | |||
03
23.01.2004
04.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE STADA Arzneimittel AG Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponents representative Hamm, Volker, Dr. Maiwald Patentanwalts-GmbH Ballindamm 37 20095 Hamburg / DE | |||
04
23.01.2004
09.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE COMBINO PHARM S.L. Fructuos Gelabert 6-8 08970 Sant Joan Despi, Barcelona / ES Opponents representative Polz, Leo, et al, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | 27.02.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.06.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.07.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/08] | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 23.04.2003 | FI | 23.04.2003 | NL | 23.04.2003 | DK | 23.07.2003 | GR | 23.07.2003 | PT | 23.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | CY | 10.12.2003 | IE | 10.12.2003 | LU | 10.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/03] | BE | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 10.12.2003 | ||
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | BE | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 10.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | BE | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | BE | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | NL | 23.04.2003 | |
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0177443 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1-19 * the whole document *; | CN1144806 [ ] (NANJING PHARMACEUTICALS INST [CN]); | [PA]DE19820974 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [PA] 1-19* the whole document *; | [A] - SU G ET AL, "Preparation of amino-diphosphinic acid and its sodium salts as bone absorption inhibitors", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19980309), vol. 128, no. 10, Database accession no. 115081, XP002134859 [A] 1-19 * abstract * | Examination | DE2405254 | EP0600834 | other | DE2405254 | EP0600834 |