EP1049956 - ACTIVE MATRIX LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Nigel, D. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/45] | Williamson, Paul Lewis Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99964481.8 | 09.11.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999EP08629 | Priority number, date | GB19980025314 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: GB 9825314 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0031581 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049956 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1049956 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1362 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
G02F1/13454 (EP,US);
G02F1/136227 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AKTIVMATRIX-FLÜSSIGKRISTALL-ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNGEN | [2000/45] | English: | ACTIVE MATRIX LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICES | [2000/45] | French: | AFFICHEURS A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES A MATRICE ACTIVE | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 24.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 07.03.2007 | [2013/46] |
Former [2009/03] | NL | 07.03.2007 | |
GB | 09.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | NL | 07.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10288797 ; | [A]JPH10198292 ; | [A]JPH09153622 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10288797 A 19981027 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10198292 A 19980731 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09153622 A 19970610 (SONY CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | US6400426 |