EP1057377 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52066 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERRA, Gunther, H. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
FISCHER, Hanns, E. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
GANSER, Hans, G. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
KRÜCKEN, Thomas Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
MOENCH, Holger Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
SNIJKERS, Rob Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Dusseldorp, Jan Charles Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Dusseldorp, Jan Charles INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99964531.0 | 02.12.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999EP09594 | Priority number, date | EP19980204287 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: EP 98204287 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0036883 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1057377 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1057377 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/292 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
H05B41/2928 (EP,US);
H05B41/00 (KR);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US);
Y10S315/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/45] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG | [2000/49] | English: | CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT | [2000/49] | French: | MONTAGE DE CIRCUIT | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 29.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02080149.4 / EP1296543 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2004 | BE | 03.11.2004 | NL | 03.11.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/51] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 03.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4410177 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1* column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE4439885 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4,6 * column 1, line 52 - column 1, line 57 * * column 4, line 43 - column 4, line 64; figures 1,2 *; | [XD]US5608294 (DERRA GUNTHER H [DE], et al) [XD] 1-4,6 * column 1, line 24 - column 2, line 53; figure 4 * |