EP1057326 - AUTOMATIC DETERMINATION OF PRESET POSITIONS CORRESPONDING TO PARTICIPANTS IN VIDEO-CONFERENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN-SOLAL, Eric Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MARTEL, Adrian, P. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
SENGUPTA, Soumitra Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
STRUBBE, Hugo Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
CAVIEDES, Jorge Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
ABDEL-MOTTALEB, Mohamed Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
ELGAMMAL, Ahmed Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99964595.5 | 14.12.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999EP10066 | Priority number, date | US19980218554 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: US 218554 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0038414 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1057326 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1057326 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N7/15, G01S3/786 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
H04N7/15 (EP,KR,US);
G01S3/7864 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/60 (KR);
H04N23/661 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/49] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE VOREINGESTELLTE TEILNEHMERPOSITIONSBESTIMMUNG FÜR VIDEOKONFERENZSYSTEME | [2000/49] | English: | AUTOMATIC DETERMINATION OF PRESET POSITIONS CORRESPONDING TO PARTICIPANTS IN VIDEO-CONFERENCES | [2000/49] | French: | DETERMINATION AUTOMATIQUE DE POSITIONS PREREGLEES CORRESPONDANT AUX PARTICIPANTS A DES VIDEO-CONFERENCES | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0578508 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6,9,11,14-18,20-24 * page 3, column 3, line 4 - page 8, column 13, line 28 * * figures 1-8 *; | [DA]US5598209 (CORTJENS LEO M [US], et al) [DA] 1-4,13-17,19-23,25 * column 5, line 30 - column 7, line 35 * * column 14, line 56 - column 18, line 46 * * column 21, line 29 - column 22, line 67 * * column 24, line 24 - column 25, line 30 ** figures 1,5,10-13 * |