EP1142328 - METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING INFORMATION AVAILABLE ON TELEVISION SCREEN TO ANOTHER MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beko Elektronik A. & Scedil Beylikdüzü Mevkii, Büyükçekmece Idot Istanbul 34901 / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Beko Elektronik A. & Scedil Beylikdüzü Mevkii, Büyükçekmece Idot, Istanbul 34901 / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENYÜREK, Sefik, Beko Elektronik A.S. Beylikdüzü Mevkii Büyükçekmece, Istanbul 34901 / TR | 02 /
ISIKBAY, Setrak, Beko Elektronik A.S. Beylikdüzü Mevkii Büyükçekmece, 34901 Istanbul / TR | 03 /
Eris, Cetin c/o Beko Elektronik A.S. Beylikdüzü Mevkii Büyükçekmece 34901 Istanbul / TR | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99964936.1 | 15.11.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999TR00047 | Priority number, date | TR19980002323 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: TR 9802323 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0030353 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1142328 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 25.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/035, H04N7/088 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
H04N7/035 (EP);
H04N7/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | 30.05.2001 | LT | 30.05.2001 | LV | 30.05.2001 | MK | 30.05.2001 | RO | 30.05.2001 | SI | 30.05.2001 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON AUF EINEM FERNSEHBILD BEREITGESTELLTER INFORMATION AUF EIN ANDERES MEDIUM | [2001/41] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING INFORMATION AVAILABLE ON TELEVISION SCREEN TO ANOTHER MEDIUM | [2001/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT D'INFORMATIONS DISPONIBLES SUR UN ECRAN DE TELEVISION SUR UN AUTRE SUPPORT | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 30.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1051746 ; | [A]DE4405019 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP10051746 A 19980430 (ANON INC.) |