EP1135875 - SYSTEM AND BASE STATION FOR PROVIDING WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SYNCHRONIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/39] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SYNCHRONIZATION | ||
[2007/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2007/28] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLACE, Mark, S. 4 Madel Lane Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 02 /
TIEDEMANN, Edward, G., Jr. 4350 Bromfield Avenue San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 03 /
WHEATLEY, Charles, E., III 570 Torrey Point Road Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 04 /
WALTSON, J., Rod 7 Ledgewood Drive Westford, MA 01886 / US | 05 /
HOWARD, J. Steven 75 Heritage Avenue Ashaland, MA 01721 / US | [2008/25] |
Former [2001/47] | 01 /
WALLACE, Mark, S. 4 Madel Lane Bedford, MA 01730 / US | ||
02 /
TIEDEMANN, Edward, G., Jr. 4350 Bromfield Avenue San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
03 /
WHEATLEY, Charles, E., III 570 Torrey Point Road Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | |||
04 /
WALTSON, J., Rod 7 Ledgewood Drive Westford, MA 01886 / US | |||
Former [2001/39] | 01 /
WALLACE, Mark, S. 4 Madel Lane Bedford, MA 01730 / US | ||
02 /
TIEDEMANN, Edward, G., Jr. 4350 Bromfield Avenue San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
03 /
WHEATLEY, Charles, E., III 2208 Caminito Del Barco Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | |||
04 /
WALTSON, J., Rod 7 Ledgewood Drive Westford, MA 01886 / US | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins &Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/39] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99965114.4 | 03.12.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999US28705 | Priority number, date | US19980206037 | 04.12.1998 Original published format: US 206037 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0035117 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1135875 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1135875 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
H04B7/2696 (EP,KR,US);
H04W56/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND BASISSTATION ZUR SYNCHRONISIERUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2007/02] | English: | SYSTEM AND BASE STATION FOR PROVIDING WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SYNCHRONIZATION | [2007/02] | French: | SYSTEME ET STATION DE BASE POUR LA SYNCHRONISATION DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2007/02] |
Former [2001/39] | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR SYNCHRONISIERUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2001/39] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM SYNCHRONIZATION | ||
Former [2001/39] | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE SYNCHRONISATION DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 27.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07010336.1 / EP1848125 | EP09165341.0 / EP2104244 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.07.2007 | BE | 11.07.2007 | CH | 11.07.2007 | CY | 11.07.2007 | DK | 11.07.2007 | LI | 11.07.2007 | NL | 11.07.2007 | GR | 12.10.2007 | ES | 22.10.2007 | IE | 03.12.2007 | LU | 03.12.2007 | PT | 11.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/48] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
IE | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0286614 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,6,7,9,10,13 * abstract * * column 3, lines 17-24 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 7 * * column 7, line 34 - column 8, line 15 * * column 8, line 47 - column 10, line 5 * * figure 5 *; | [XA]US5363376 (CHUANG JUSTIN C [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 10, lines 12-39 * * column 11, line 63 - column 12, line 14 * * column 12, line 41 - column 14, line 14 * * column 15, lines 45-52 * * figures 2,3 * * claim - * [A] 2-14; | [XA]US5528597 (GERSZBERG IRWIN [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 13 * * column 2, lines 51-60 * * column 4, lines 4-14 * * column 4, lines 22-32 * * figures 4,5 * * claim - * [A] 2-14; | [XA]WO9831111 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-14; | EP0903873 [ ] (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [ ] * column 7, line 32 - column 8, line 42 * * column 15, lines 32-55 * * column 17, lines 19-46 * * figures 5,6 * * claim - *; | [A] - LAGRANGE X ET AL, "AUTONOMOUS INTER BASE STATION SYNCHRONISATION VIA A COMMON BROADCAST CONTROL CHANNEL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1994), vol. CONF. 44, ISBN 0-7803-1928-1, pages 1050 - 1054, XP000496838 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |