EP1140471 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A BI-AXIALLY ORIENTED, HEAT-SHRINKABLE, POLYOLEFIN MULTI-LAYER FILM AND FILM OBTAINED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Revocation of patent | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road Duncan, SC 29334 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road Duncan, S.C. 29334 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORLONI, Roberto Via Montenevoso, 30 I-20014 Garbatola di Nerviano / IT | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Fraire, Cristina, et al Sealed Air S.r.l. Via Trento, 7 20017 Passirana di Rho (MI) / IT | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/40] | De Carli, Elda Sealed Air S.p.A. Packaging Technical Center Via Trento 7 20017 Passirana di Rho (MI) / IT | ||
Former [2001/41] | De Carli, Elda Sealed Air S.r.l., Via Trento 7 20017 Passirana di Rho (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 99965451.0 | 13.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP09857 | Priority number, date | EP19980124109 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: EP 98124109 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0037240 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140471 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140471 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29C55/16, B32B27/32 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
B29C55/023 (EP);
B32B27/08 (US);
B29C55/16 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B37/153 (US);
B29K2023/0625 (EP);
B32B2038/0028 (US);
B32B2307/518 (US);
B32B2307/736 (US);
B32B2309/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BIAXIAL ORIENTIERTEN, WÄRMESCHRUMPFBAREN, MEHRSCHICHTIGEN POLYOLEFINFOLIE UND DADURCH ERHALTENE FOLIE | [2001/41] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A BI-AXIALLY ORIENTED, HEAT-SHRINKABLE, POLYOLEFIN MULTI-LAYER FILM AND FILM OBTAINED THEREBY | [2001/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN FILM MULTICOUCHE DE POLYOLEFINE THERMORETRACTABLE ET A ORIENTATION BI-AXIALE ET FILM OBTENU PAR CE PROCEDE | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 07.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.2005
16.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Bimo Italia S.p.A Via E. Tazzoli 6 20154 Milano / IT Opponent's representative Sama, Daniele Sama Patents Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.2005
16.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Bimo Italia S.p.A Via E. Tazzoli 6 20154 Milano / IT Opponent's representative Sama, Daniele, Dr. Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | 13.07.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.01.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/21] | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2004 | BE | 08.09.2004 | CH | 08.09.2004 | CY | 08.09.2004 | FI | 08.09.2004 | LI | 08.09.2004 | NL | 08.09.2004 | DK | 08.12.2004 | GR | 08.12.2004 | SE | 08.12.2004 | IE | 13.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | PT | 08.02.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
CY | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 13.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 13.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 08.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4343852 (ISAKA TSUTOMU, et al) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 10, line 23 - line 44 *; | [X]EP0282282 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 31 - line 35; example 1 *; | [A]EP0688667 (4 P FOLIE FORCHHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 19 - line 40 *; | [X]WO9633864 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-15 * page 9, line 35 - page 10, line 33 * * page 13, line 10 - page 14, line 7; claims 12,13,28,34-37,39 * |