EP1144484 - AMPHIPHILIC BLOCK COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
CY
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
CY
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2003/10] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
CY
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Vienna / AT | |||
Former [2001/42] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
CY
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunnerstrasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRT, Thomas Rohnackerstrasse 32 CH-9445 Rebstein / CH | 02 /
HOLLAND, Troy, Vernon 2775 Northcliff Drive Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | 03 /
SCHREMMER, Jacalyn, Mary 1270 Mayfair Drive Atlanta, GA 30324 / US | 04 /
BARON, Richard, Carlton 115 Kiltirnan Court Alpharetta, GA 30201 / US | 05 /
TERRY, Wilson, Leonard, Jr. 4830 NW 43rd Street Gainesville, FL 32606 / US | 06 /
MOLENBERG, Aaldert, Rens Therwilerstrasse 20 CH-4054 Basel / CH | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2003/20] | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2001/42] | Becker, Konrad, et al Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 99965499.9 | 20.12.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999EP10125 | Priority number, date | US19980217238 | 21.12.1998 Original published format: US 217238 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0037541 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144484 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144484 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08G81/00, G02B1/04 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
C08G81/00 (EP);
C08G73/02 (EP);
C08G77/452 (EP);
G02B1/043 (EP)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/043, C08L83/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMPHIPHILE BLOCKCOPOLYMERE | [2001/42] | English: | AMPHIPHILIC BLOCK COPOLYMERS | [2001/42] | French: | COPOLYMERES AMPHIPHILES RETICULABLES | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2004 | BE | 25.08.2004 | CH | 25.08.2004 | CY | 25.08.2004 | FI | 25.08.2004 | LI | 25.08.2004 | NL | 25.08.2004 | DK | 25.11.2004 | GR | 25.11.2004 | SE | 25.11.2004 | ES | 06.12.2004 | IE | 20.12.2004 | LU | 20.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | PT | 25.01.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
CY | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
NL | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
LU | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
NL | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
IE | 20.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 25.08.2004 | |
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 25.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS4954499 ; | [A]US4659777 (RIFFLE JUDY S [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [DA]WO9749740 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1 * claims 12,6,11,15-21 * * page 18, line 7 - line 14 *; | [DPX]WO9912059 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [DPX] 1-3,14-20 * claims 1,2,7-9,22 * * page 7, line 19 - line 24 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1974, no. 45, Database accession no. 1974-78210V, XP002136382 & JPS4954499 A 19740527 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |