EP1139830 - KETTLE WITH SECURITY CUT-OFF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Efbe Elektrogeräte GmbH Rudolstäter Strasse 21 07422 Bad Blankenburg / DE | [2001/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINZE, Bernd Altstadt 23 D-07462 Königsee / DE | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Gulde, Klaus W., et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Gulde, Klaus W., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig Schützenstrasse 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 99965550.9 | 24.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP10357 | Priority number, date | DE1998160931 | 30.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19860931 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0040128 | Date: | 13.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1139830 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1139830 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/21, A47J31/20 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
A47J31/20 (EP);
A47J27/21041 (EP);
A47J27/2105 (EP);
A47J27/21083 (EP);
A47J27/21166 (EP);
A47J27/21175 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERKOCHER MIT SICHERHEITSABSCHALTUNG | [2001/41] | English: | KETTLE WITH SECURITY CUT-OFF | [2001/41] | French: | BOUILLOIRE AVEC MISE HORS CIRCUIT DE SECURITE | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 08.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 19.03.2003 | FR | 19.03.2003 | GB | 19.03.2003 | GR | 19.03.2003 | IE | 19.03.2003 | IT | 19.03.2003 | NL | 19.03.2003 | DK | 19.06.2003 | SE | 19.06.2003 | PT | 20.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | [2008/18] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
FR | 19.03.2003 | ||
GB | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GB | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GB | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
NL | 19.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
NL | 19.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE3222542 (VOLZ ABC ELEKTROGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 3,16,17 * page 12, line 12 - line 14 * * claims 1,8,14 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 11,12,14; | [XY]DE8915662U (VANDAELE, STEPHAN) [X] 1,4,6,14,15 * page 2, line 25 - page 4, line 6 * * figure 1 * [Y] 3,7,8,13,16,17; | [Y]EP0419368 (SEB SA [FR]) [Y] 7,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0528656 (STRIX LTD [GB]) [A] 19* abstract *; | [YA]DE19706523 (RUHL THOMAS [DE]) [Y] 13 * abstract * [A] 1 |