EP1149386 - FUEL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Sweden AB 721 83 Västeras / SE | [2004/19] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Westinghouse Atom AB 721 63 Västeras / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NYLUND, Olov Ragnaröksgatan 17 S-723 55 Väster s / SE | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Berglund, Stefan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O. Box 5366 102 49 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Berglund, Stefan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58 114 50 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/44] | Berglund, Stefan Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58 114 50 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99965633.3 | 10.12.1999 | [2001/44] | WO1999SE02310 | Priority number, date | SE19980004545 | 23.12.1998 Original published format: SE 9804545 | [2001/44] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0039807 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1149386 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1149386 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/18, // G21C3/16 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
G21C3/16 (EP);
G21C3/18 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/44] | G21C3/18, // G21C3:16 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, SE [2004/30] |
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTABBÜNDEL | [2001/44] | English: | FUEL ASSEMBLY | [2001/44] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE COMBUSTIBLE | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2001 | Translation filed | 19.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 19.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 21.10.2004 | [2005/10] | Cited in | International search | [X]SE508645 (ASEA ATOM AB [SE]); | [A]US3671393 (WILLIAMS ALBERT ETHERIDGE); | [A]EP0514121 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]SE504128 (ASEA ATOM AB [SE]); | [A]WO9620483 (ASEA ATOM AB [SE], et al) |