EP1133269 - CONTROLLED RELEASE SYSTEM FOR DELIVERING THERAPEUTIC AGENTS INTO THE INNER EAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Durect Corporation 10240 Bubb Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2001/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARENBERG, Irving, K. 5860 Goldsmith Place Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US | 02 /
ARENBERG, Michael, H. 107 Birch Wood Court Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | 03 /
LEMKE, Christine, MelTec GmbH Leiziger Str. 44 Zenit-Gebäude HS65 39120 Magdeburg / DE | 04 /
BERGLUND, John, A. 3722 Raleigh Street Denver, CO 80212 / US | 05 /
THEEUWES, Felix 27350 Altamont Road Los Gatos, CA 95129 / US | [2007/07] |
Former [2001/38] | 01 /
ARENBERG, Irving, K. 5860 Goldsmith Place Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US | ||
02 /
ARENBERG, Michael, H. 107 Birch Wood Court Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | |||
03 /
LEMKE, Christine MeltecTec GmbH Leiziger Str. 44 Zenit-Gebäude HS65 39120 Magdeburg / DE | |||
04 /
BERGLUND, John, A. 3722 Raleigh Street Denver, CO 80212 / US | |||
05 /
THEEUWES, Felix 27350 Altamont Road Los Gatos, CA 95129 / US | Representative(s) | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestraße 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Ostertag, Ulrich, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 70597 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2001/38] | Harrison, David Christopher MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99965987.3 | 03.12.1999 | [2001/38] | WO1999US28716 | Priority number, date | US19980205251 | 04.12.1998 Original published format: US 205251 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0033775 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133269 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1133269 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F11/00, A61K9/00 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
A61K9/0046 (EP,US);
A61F11/00 (EP,US);
A61M31/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESTEUERTES FREISETZUNGSSYSTEM ZUR ABGABE VON THERAPEUTIKA IN DEN INNENOHRKANAL | [2001/38] | English: | CONTROLLED RELEASE SYSTEM FOR DELIVERING THERAPEUTIC AGENTS INTO THE INNER EAR | [2001/38] | French: | SYSTEME A LIBERATION CONTROLEE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION D'AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES A L'INTERIEUR DE L'OREILLE INTERNE | [2001/38] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 13.09.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.05.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06024761.6 / EP1767175 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.02.2007 | [2010/06] | Cited in | International search | [YD]US5476446 (ARENBERG IRVING K [US]) [YD] 9-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 38 * * column 19, line 25 - line 37 * * claim 11 *; | [A]DE19508029 (SUEVERKRUEP RICHARD PROF DR [DE], et al) [A] * page 3, line 43 - line 57 ** claims 1,18,19 *; | [XY]WO9738698 (UNIV TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 30 * * claims 1,2 * [Y] 9-13; | [PX]US5954682 (PETRUS EDWARD J [US]) [PX] 14-18,20-22 * column 3, line 13 - line 27 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 23 * * column 6, line 25 - column 7, line 6 * * claims 2,11 * * figures 1-6 * |