EP1141099 - FILMS COMPRISING BIODEGRADABLE PHA COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NODA, Isao 1568 Hunter Road Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2003/09] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2001/41] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 99966161.4 | 13.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999US29485 | Priority number, date | US19980218133 | 21.12.1998 Original published format: US 218133 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0037544 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1141099 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1141099 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, // C08L67:04 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2367/04 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/14] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL | Title | German: | FILME DIE BIOABBAUBARE PHA-COPOLYMERE ENTHALTEN | [2002/44] | English: | FILMS COMPRISING BIODEGRADABLE PHA COPOLYMERS | [2001/41] | French: | FILMS RENFERMANT DES COPOLYMERES PHA BIODEGRADABLES | [2001/41] |
Former [2001/41] | FILME DIE PHA BIOABBAUBARE COPOLYMERE ENTHALTEN | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.2002 | Observations by third parties | 23.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 03.07.2003 | [2004/05] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0533144 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1* claims 1,4,5 *; | [X]WO9520614 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-18 * claims 1-13 *; | [X]WO9520615 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-18 * claims 1-11 * * page 12, line 15 - line 16 * * page 5, line 1 - line 17 * * examples 3-5 *; | [X]EP0824148 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO [JP]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 20 - line 21 * * claims 1,8-10,12 * | other | EP0274151 | EP0304293 | JPH01304891 | US5004664 | WO9218553 | EP0533144 | JPH07438 | JPH07275344 | WO9600263 | JPH0889264 | JPH09191893 | - BRANDL H. ET AL, "PSEUDOMONAS OLEOVORANS AS A SOURCE OF POLY(BETA-HYDROXYALKANOATES) FOR POTENTIAL APPLICATIONS AS BIODEGRADABLE POLYESTERS", APPL.ENVIRON.MICROBIOL., (1998), vol. 54, no. 8, pages 1977 - 1982, XP000570085 | - STEINBÜCHEL A., "Poly(hydroxyfettsäuren) - Speicherstoffe von Bakterien: Biosybthese und Genetik", FORUM MIKROBIOLOGIE, (1989), vol. 4, pages 190 - 198 | - RAMSAY B.A. ET AL, "Produktion of poly-beta-hydroxyalkanoic acid by Pseudomonas cepacia", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1989), vol. 55, pages 584 - 589 | - GROSS R. ET AL, "The biosynthesis and characterizazion of new poly-(beta-hydroxyalkanoates)", ABSTR. PAP. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1989), vol. 197, page BETC43 | - DOI Y., "Production, properties, and biodegradation of microbial copolyesters of 3-hydroxybutyrate and 4-hydroxybutyrate-copolyester production by Alcaligenes eutrophus", ABSTR. PAP. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1989), vol. 197, page BETC45 | - HUISMAN G.W. ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF POLY-3-HYDROXYALKANOATES IS A COMMON FEATURE OF FLUORESCENT PSEUDOMONADS", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (19890801), vol. 55, no. 8, pages 1949 - 1954, XP000106558 | - HAYWOOD G.W. ET AL, "ACCUMULATION OF A POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE CONTAINING PRIMARILY 3-HYDROXYDECANOATE FROM SIMPLE CARBOHYDRATE SUBSTRATES BY PSEUDOMONAS", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (19901101), vol. 56, no. 11, pages 3354 - 3359, XP000569443 | - TIMM A.; STEINBÜCHEL A., "Formation of ployesters consisting of medium-chain-lenght 3-hydroxyalkanoic acids from gluconate by Pseudomonas aeruginosa and other fluorescent Pseudomonads", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1990), vol. 56, pages 3360 - 3367 | - AMOS D.A.; MCINERNEY M.J., "Composition of poly-beta-Hydroxyalkanoate from Syntrophomonas-Wolfei Grown on Unsaturated Fatty Acid Substrates", ARCH. MICROBIOL., (1991), vol. 155, pages 103 - 106 | - RAMSAY B.A. ET AL, "Continuous Production of Long-Side-Chain Poly-beta-Hydroxyalkanoates by Pseudomonas-Oleovorans", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1991), vol. 57, pages 625 - 629 | - HAYWOOD G.W. ET AL, "Accumulation of a Poly(hydroxyalkanoate) Copolymer Containing Primarily 3-Hydroxyvalerate from Simple Carbohydrate Substrates by Rhodococcus sp NCIMB 40126", INT. J. BIOL. MACROMOL., (1991), vol. 13, pages 83 - 88 | - VALENTIN H.E. ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF 4-HYDROXYVALERIC ACID AS A CONSTITUENT OF BIOSYNTHETIC POLYHYDROXYALKANOIC ACIDS FROM BACTERIA", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 36, pages 507 - 514, XP000983197 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00170193 | - MARCHESSAULT R.H. ET AL, "Poly(Beta-hydroxyalkanoates): biorefinery polymers in search of applications", MAKROMOL. CHEM. MOCROMOL. SYMP., (1988), vol. 19, pages 235 - 254 | - EGGINK G. ET AL, "Synthesis of Poly-3-hydroxy-alkanoate (PHA's) by Pseudomonas; substrates, polymerases, bioreactor configuration, and products", PAP. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1992), vol. 204, page PMSE73 | - LIEBERGESELL M. ET AL, "Analysis of polyhydroxyalkanoic acid-biosynthesis genes of anoxygenic phototrophic bacteria reveals synthesis of a polyester exhibiting an unusual composition", APPL. MICR. B., (1993), vol. 40, pages 292 - 300 | - VALENTIN H.E. ET AL, "Identification of 4-hydroxyhexanoic acid as a new constituent of biosynthetic polyhydroxyalkanoic acids from Bacteria", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1994), vol. 40, pages 710 - 716 | - NAKAMURO S. ET AL, "MICROBIAL SYNTHESIS AND CHARACTERIZATION OF POLY (3-HYDROXYBUTYRATE-CO-4-HYDROXYBUTYRATE)", MACROMOLECULES, (19920817), vol. 25, no. 17, pages 4237 - 4241, XP000293300 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00043a001 | - ULMER H.W. ET AL, "BACTERIAL PRODUCTION OF POLY(BETA-HYDROXYALKANOATES) CONTAINING UNSATURATED REPEATING UNITS BY RHODOSPIRILLUM RUBRUM", MACROMOLECULES, (19940328), vol. 27, no. 7, pages 1675 - 1679, XP000433194 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00085a002 | - SCHOLZ C. ET AL, "Production of poly(beta-hydroxyalkanoates) wit beta-substituents containing terminal ester groups by Pseudomonas oleovorans", MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (1994), vol. 195, page 1405 | - SCHOLZ C. ET AL, "Growth and polymer incorporation of Pseudomonas oleovorans on alkyl esters of heptanoic acid", MACROMOL., (1994), vol. 27, pages 2886 - 2889 | - SAITO Y. AND DOI Y., "Microbial synthesis and properties of poly(3-hydroxybutyrate-co-4-hydroxybutyrate in Comamonas-acidovorans", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL MACROMOLECULES, (1994), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 99 - 104, XP002101839 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-8130(94)90022-1 | - SONG J.J.; CHUL Y., "Isolation of Pseudomonas-Putida BMO1 accumulating high amount of PHA(MCL)", J. MICROB. BIOTECHNOL., (1994), vol. 4, pages 126 - 133 | - RITTER H.; VON SPEE A., "Bacterial production of polyesters bearing phenoxy groups in the side chains, 1", CCC, (1994), pages 1022 - 1352 | - HIRAMITSU M. ET AL, "Production of poly(r-hydroxybutyrate-co-4-hydroxybutyrate) by Alcaligenes latus", BIOTECHNOL. LETT., (1993), vol. 15, pages 461 - 464 | - LEE E.Y., "Biosynthesis of copolyesters consisting of 3-hydroxybutyric acid and medium-chain-lenght 3-hydroxyalkanoic acids from 1,3-butanediol or from 3-hydroxybutyrate by Pseudomonas sp. A33", APPL. MICR. B., (1995), vol. 424, pages 901 - 909 | - CABALLERO K. ET AL, "Biosynthesis and characterization of hydroxybutyrate- hydroxycaproate copolymers", INT. J. MACROMOL., (1995), vol. 17, pages 86 - 92 | - DOI Y. ET AL, "MICROBIAL SYNTHESIS AND CHARACTERIZATION OF POLY(3-HYDROXYBUTYRATE-CO-3-HYDROXYHEXANOATE)", MACROMOLECULES, (19950703), vol. 28, no. 14, pages 4822 - 4828, XP000517425 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma00118a007 | - VALENTIN H.E.; DENNIS D., "Production of poly(3-hydroxybutyrate-co-4-hydroxybutyrate) in recombinant Escherichia coli grown on glucose", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (19971002), vol. 58, no. 1, pages 33 - 38, XP004126101 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1656(97)00127-2 | - ZINN M. ET AL, "Occurrence, synthesis and medical application of bacterial polyhydroxyalkanoate", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (2001), vol. 53, pages 5 - 21 |