EP1144133 - PLASMA ENHANCED POLYMER DEPOSITION ONTO FIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE Pacific Northwest Laboratories Intellectual Property Services 902 Battelle Boulevard P.O. Box 999 Richland, WA 99352 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE Pacific Northwest Laboratories P.O. Box 999 Richland, WA 99352 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AFFINITO, John, D. 5745 North Campbell Avenue Tucson, Arizona 85718 / US | [2001/47] |
Former [2001/42] | 01 /
AFFINITO, John, D. 2718 Kyle Road Kennewick, WA 99338 / US | Representative(s) | Caldwell, Judith Margaret, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Caldwell, Judith Margaret, et al David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99966364.4 | 15.12.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999US30071 | Priority number, date | US19980212774 | 16.12.1998 Original published format: US 212774 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0035604 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144133 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B05D7/24 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
B05D1/62 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Title | German: | PLASMA UNTERSTÜTZTE POLYMER DAMPFABSCHEIDUNG AUF KÖRPERN | [2001/42] | English: | PLASMA ENHANCED POLYMER DEPOSITION ONTO FIXTURES | [2001/42] | French: | DEPOT POLYMERE ACTIVE PAR PLASMA SUR DES STRUCTURES | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 12.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/38] | 03.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0340935 (SPECTRUM CONTROL INC [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [PX]WO9916931 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * |