EP1137522 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS VACUUM FORMING SHAPED POLYMERIC ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Change - representative | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CertainTeed Corporation 750 East Swedesford Road, P.O.Box 860 Valley Forge Pennsylvania 19482-0101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Certainteed Corporation 750 East Swedesford Road, P.O.Box 860 Valley Forge, Pennsylvania 19482-0101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILBERT, Thomas 8348 South Jackson Road Clark Lake, MI 99234 / US | 02 /
BOSLER, Kenneth, D. 82 Mulberry Drive Holland, PA 18966 / US | 03 /
DELL, Edward, C. 6900 McCain Road Spring Arbor, MI 49283 / US | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2001/40] | Phillips, Patricia Marie, et al Wilson Gunn M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99967103.5 | 12.11.1999 | [2001/40] | WO1999US26841 | Priority number, date | US19980190038 | 12.11.1998 Original published format: US 190038 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0027604 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1137522 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B29C31/00 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
B29C51/24 (EP,US);
B29C53/34 (EP,US);
B29C2035/1616 (EP,US);
B29C2791/001 (EP,US);
B29C2791/006 (EP,US);
B29C2793/009 (EP,US);
B29C48/00 (EP,US);
B29C48/001 (EP,US);
B29C48/0017 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/13 (EP,US);
B29C51/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/40] | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN VAKUUMFORMEN GEFORMTER POLYMERGEGENSTÄNDE | [2001/40] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS VACUUM FORMING SHAPED POLYMERIC ARTICLES | [2001/40] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR ASPIRATION CONTINUE DES ARTICLES POLYMERES PROFILES | [2001/40] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 21.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3982868 (RINKER WILLIAM RICHARD) [A] 1-20 * figure 1 ** claims 1-5 *; | [Y]US4389179 (WESTCOTT ROBERT F, et al) [Y] 1-20 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 59 - line 66 * * column 2, line 53 - line 64 *; | [Y]US4649008 (JOHNSTONE THOMAS O [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 6 - line 8 * * column 4, line 14 - line 18 * * column 4, line 27 - line 30 * * column 4, line 51 - line 55 * * column 5, line 11 - line 13 * * column 5, line 25 - line 29 * * column 5, line 59 - line 62 *; | [PY]US5906840 (BOSLER KENNETH [US], et al) [PY] 1-20 * claim 1 * * figure 2 *; | [E]US2001039778 (KING DANIEL W [US]) [E] 1-20 * figures 4,9 * * claims 1,6 * * column 1 - column 2, line 6 * * column 3, line 3 - line 10 * * column 5, line 31 - line 34 * | International search | [A]US3577484 (JACOBSON WILLIAM P); | [Y]US3635614 (LONG ALFRED R, et al); | [A]US4128369 (KEMERER WILLIAM J, et al); | [Y]US5314325 (BOSLER KENNETH [US]); | [Y]US5505612 (MERO CHRISTOPHER [US], et al); | [Y]US5597185 (BRAY VERNE [US], et al) |