EP1161323 - METHOD FOR FORMING A SUPERABRASIVE POLYCRYSTALLINE CUTTING TOOL WITH AN INTEGRAL CHIPBREAKER FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U.S. Synthetic Corporation 1260 South 1600 West Orem, UT 84058 / US | [2001/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Kenneth, M. 275 East 1075 North Springville, UT 84663 / US | 02 /
MIESS, David 9595 North 6050 West Highland, UT 84003 / US | 03 /
POPE, Bill, J. 1866 North 1450 East Provo, UT 84604 / US | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Bublak, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Bublak, Wolfgang, Dr., et al Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/32] | Ricker, Mathias, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/50] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99967456.7 | 20.12.1999 | [2001/50] | WO1999US30360 | Priority number, date | US19990253581 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: US 253581 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0048789 | Date: | 24.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161323 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/00, B24D17/00, B24D18/00, B23P15/28 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
B24D18/0009 (EP,KR,US);
B24D3/00 (KR);
B22F7/06 (EP,US);
B23B27/143 (EP,US);
B23P15/28 (EP,US);
E21B10/5671 (EP,KR,US);
E21B10/5673 (EP,KR,US);
E21B10/5676 (EP,US);
B22F2005/001 (EP,US);
B22F2005/005 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B23B2200/081 (EP,US);
Y10T407/118 (EP,US);
Y10T407/235 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F5/00 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10, B22F3/1208, B22F7/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/50] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SUPER-ABRASIVEN POLYKRISTALLINEN SCHNEIDWERKZEUGS MIT INTEGRIERTER SPANBRUCH-FUNKTION | [2001/50] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING A SUPERABRASIVE POLYCRYSTALLINE CUTTING TOOL WITH AN INTEGRAL CHIPBREAKER FEATURE | [2001/50] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FORMER UN OUTIL DE COUPE POLYCRISTALLIN SUPERABRASIF PRESENTANT UNE CARACTERISTIQUE INTRINSEQUE DE BRISE-COPEAUX | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.09.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 01.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 04.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2002 | 31.12.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3745623 (WENTORF R, et al); | [Y]US4957396 (NIEBAUER KENNETH L [US]); | [Y]US4984642 (RENARD PAUL [FR], et al); | [Y]US5026960 (SLUTZ DAVID E [US], et al); | [Y]US5569000 (LITTECKE PETER [SE], et al) |