EP1116298 - DUAL OPERATION MODE FILTER USING SUPERCONDUCTING RESONATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILLINOIS SUPERCONDUCTOR CORPORATION 451 Kingston Court Mt. Prospect, IL 60056 / US | [2001/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABDELMONEM, Amr 3310 Old Mill Road Northbrook, IL 60062 / US | [2001/36] |
Former [2001/29] | 01 /
ABDELMONEM, Amr Apartment 106 2754 Buffalo Grove Road Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99968019.2 | 14.09.1999 | [2001/29] | WO1999US21184 | Priority number, date | US19980158631 | 22.09.1998 Original published format: US 158631 | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0022691 | Date: | 20.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1116298 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/205 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
H01P1/2053 (EP,US);
H01P1/205 (KR);
Y10S505/70 (EP,US);
Y10S505/701 (EP,US);
Y10S505/866 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/29] | Title | German: | FILTER MIT ZWEI BETRIEBSARTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG SUPRALEITENDER RESONATOREN | [2001/29] | English: | DUAL OPERATION MODE FILTER USING SUPERCONDUCTING RESONATORS | [2001/29] | French: | FILTRE BIMODAL UTILISANT DES RESONATEURS SUPRACONDUCTEURS | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 29.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/14] | 20.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.05.2001 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | 03.05.2001 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.05.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 31.12.2002 | [2003/28] | Cited in | International search | [X]US5804534 (ZAKI KAWTHAR ABDELHAMID [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 28 - line 38 * * column 4, line 8 - line 21; figure 1; claim 16 *; | [A]WO9642118 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 29 - line 30 * * page 10, line 16 - line 24 * * page 11, line 1 - line 11; figure 11; claim 9 *; | [A]GB2235828 (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 20; figure 3 *; | [A]US5616540 (LITHGOW ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 17 - line 56; figure 11 *; | [A]JPH10224110 ; | [A]JPH10224269 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10224110 A 19980821 (IDOTAI TSUSHIN SENTAN GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10224269 A 19980821 (N T T IDO TSUSHINMO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |