EP1141083 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HIGHLY BRANCHED GLYCIDOL-BASED POLYOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDER, Alexander Jacob-Burckhardt-Strasse 11 D-79098 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
MÜLHAUPT, Rolf Ferdinand-Kopf-Strasse 9 D-79117 Freiburg / DE | [2001/41] | Application number, filing date | 99968792.4 | 10.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP09773 | Priority number, date | DE1998159300 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19859300 | DE1999147631 | 04.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19947631 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0037532 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1141083 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1141083 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/22, C08G83/00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C08G65/2648 (EP);
C08G18/48 (EP);
C08G65/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHVERZWEIGTEN POLYOLEN AUF DER BASIS VON GLYCIDOL | [2001/41] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HIGHLY BRANCHED GLYCIDOL-BASED POLYOLS | [2001/41] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES POLYOLS HAUTEMENT RAMIFIES A PARTIR DE GLYCIDOL | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.08.2004 | FI | 18.08.2004 | IE | 18.08.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | SE | 18.11.2004 | AT | 10.12.2004 | LU | 10.12.2004 | CH | 31.12.2004 | LI | 31.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | CY | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
AT | 10.12.2004 | ||
LU | 10.12.2004 | ||
CH | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
AT | 10.12.2004 | ||
CH | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
CH | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 18.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09235246 ; | [A]DE3233251 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * examples 1-5 *; | [AD]EP0116978 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [AD] 1-5* examples 1-10 *; | [A] - DWORAK A, "CATIONIC POLYMERISATION OF GLYCIDOL", INTERNATIONAL POLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY,GB,RAPRA TECHNOLOGIES, SHROPSHIRE, (19951101), vol. 22, no. 11, ISSN 0307-174X, pages T - 91-T-95, XP000583789 [A] 1-5 * tables 2,3 * * page 92, line 1 - line 7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09235246 A 19970909 (LION CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |