EP1145389 - UNIT FOR AUTOMATICALLY CRIMPING FLEXIBLE FLAT CABLE LAYERS AND CORRESPONDING CRIMPING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S-Y Systems Technologies France SAS 90, boulevard National 92257 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [2003/29] |
Former [2002/21] | For all designated states Siemens Automotive EEDS Systems 1, Avenue Paul Ourliac, BP 1149 31036 Toulouse Cedex 01 / FR | ||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE S.A. Avenue du Mirail, Boîte Postale 1149 31036 Toulouse Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLEMANS, Roel 11, rue des Champs F-31170 Tournefeuille / FR | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Beck, Josef, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Wilhelm & Beck Prinzenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Beck, Josef, et al c/o Patentanwaltskanzlei Wilhelm & Beck Nymphenburger Strasse 139 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/15] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99968805.4 | 20.12.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999EP10119 | Priority number, date | FR19980016332 | 23.12.1998 Original published format: FR 9816332 | [2001/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0039899 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1145389 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1145389 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/048, H01R43/052 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
H01R43/28 (EP,US);
H01R12/59 (EP,US);
H01R43/048 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49181 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49185 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5187 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53209 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53213 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53217 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53235 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI [2002/40] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE KRIMPVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLEXIBLE FLACHBANDKABEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2001/42] | English: | UNIT FOR AUTOMATICALLY CRIMPING FLEXIBLE FLAT CABLE LAYERS AND CORRESPONDING CRIMPING METHOD | [2001/42] | French: | UNITE DE SERTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE NAPPES DE CABLES PLATS FLEXIBLES ET PROCEDE DE SERTISSAGE CORRESPONDANT | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0413655 (MECANISMOS AUX IND [ES]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * column 9, line 29 - column 11, line 19 *; | [A]DE9307220U (LIGMATECH MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 3 * * page 1, line 6 - line 24 * * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 20 *; | [A]US4217977 (TAM JOHANN [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 24 *; | [A]US4126935 (RHINES WARREN J, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 42 *; | [A]EP0167985 (INARCA SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 4, line 25 - page 7, line 15 * |