EP1114012 - FIELD ASSISTED TRANSFORMATION OF CHEMICAL AND MATERIAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanomaterials Research Corporation 2620 Trade Center Avenue Longmont, CO 80503 / US | [2001/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YADAV, Tapesh 2620 Trade Center Avenue Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 02 /
MERAMADI, Bijan 2620 Trade Center Avenue Longmont, CO 80503 / US | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2003/23] | Moore, Barry, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2001/28] | Parkes, Andrew John Aykroyd, et al c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 99969081.1 | 20.08.1999 | [2001/28] | WO1999US19379 | Priority number, date | US19980100269P | 14.09.1998 Original published format: US 100269 P | US19980165439 | 02.10.1998 Original published format: US 165439 | US19980110710P | 03.12.1998 Original published format: US 110710 P | US19990286698 | 06.04.1999 Original published format: US 286698 | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0015586 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1114012 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/08, C07C1/00, C25B1/00, C25B1/02, C25B3/00, C25B9/00 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
B01J8/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07C1/00 (KR);
B01D53/32 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/86 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/087 (EP,KR,US);
B82B1/00 (KR);
C01B17/78 (EP,KR,US);
C01B21/265 (EP,KR,US);
C01B3/16 (EP,KR,US);
C01B3/323 (EP,US);
C01B3/326 (EP,KR,US);
C01C1/0411 (EP,KR,US);
C01C1/0482 (EP,KR,US);
C25B1/00 (KR);
B01J2219/0807 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/1041 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1052 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/1064 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/1076 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/1082 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/28] | C07C1/00, C25B1/00, C25B1/02, C25B3/00, C25B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/28] | Title | German: | FELDUNTERSTÜTZTE UMWANDLUNG VON CHEMISCHEN- UND MATERIALZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2001/28] | English: | FIELD ASSISTED TRANSFORMATION OF CHEMICAL AND MATERIAL COMPOSITIONS | [2001/28] | French: | TRANSFORMATION DE COMPOSITIONS CHIMIQUES ET DE SUBSTANCES A L'AIDE D'UN CHAMP ELECTROMAGNETIQUE | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/12] | 21.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1100088 (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | [X]US3674666 (FOSTER RICHARD N, et al); | [X]DE4220865 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]); | [A]US5194128 (BEATY JOHN S [US], et al); | [X]WO9729833 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH], et al); | [PX]WO9906825 (NANOMATERIALS RESEARCH CORP [US]) | International search | [X]JPS4820104B ; | [X]JPS61278346 (ASAKAWA YUKICHI, et al) |