EP1151267 - MICROFLUIDIC CIRCUIT DESIGNS FOR PERFORMING ELECTROKINETIC MANIPULATIONS THAT REDUCE THE NUMBER OF VOLTAGE SOURCES AND FLUID RESERVOIRS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UT-Battelle, LLC Oak Ridge National Laboratory, PO Box 2008, MS 6498 Oak Ridge, TN 37831-6498 / US | [2008/22] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states UT-Battelle, LLC P.O. Box 2008, MS-6498 Oak Ridge, TN 37831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSON, Stephen, C. 3639 Taliluna Drive D-1 Knoxville, TN 37919 / US | 02 /
RAMSEY, J., Michael 733 Hampton Roads Drive Knoxville, TN 37922 / US | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99969278.3 | 15.12.1999 | [2001/45] | WO1999US29741 | Priority number, date | US19980212217 | 16.12.1998 Original published format: US 212217 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0036390 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1151267 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1151267 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/00, B01F13/00 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
B01L3/50273 (EP,US);
B01L3/502 (EP,US);
B01L3/502746 (EP,US);
G01N1/38 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0867 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0415 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,US);
B01L2400/084 (EP,US);
Y10S366/03 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2076 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/45] | G01N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/22] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DESIGN FÜR MIKROFLUIDISCHEN KREIS ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG ELEKTROKINETISCHER MANIPULATIONEN, DIE DIE ANZAHL VON SPANNUNGSQUELLEN UND FLUID-RESERVOIRS REDUZIEREN | [2001/45] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC CIRCUIT DESIGNS FOR PERFORMING ELECTROKINETIC MANIPULATIONS THAT REDUCE THE NUMBER OF VOLTAGE SOURCES AND FLUID RESERVOIRS | [2001/45] | French: | CONCEPTIONS DE CIRCUITS MICROFLUIDES POUR MANIPULATIONS ELECTROCINETIQUES REDUISANT LE NOMBRE DE SOURCES DE TENSION ET DE RESERVOIRS DE FLUIDES | [2001/45] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 14.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2008 | BE | 28.05.2008 | CY | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | IT | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | SE | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | ES | 08.09.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | IE | 15.12.2008 | LU | 15.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/44] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CY | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
LU | 15.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 15.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 08.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9604547 (LOCKHEED MARTIN ENERGY SYS INC [US], et al) [Y] 16,17 * page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 21 * * page 11, line 29 - page 12, line 23 * * page 14, line 34 - page 15, line 9 * * page 42, line 32 - page 43, line 27 * * figures 1,3 *[A] 1-15,18-22; | [XAY]EP0727661 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 13 - line 15 * * column 1, line 31 - line 37 * * column 3, line 21 - line 47 * * claim 5 * * figure . * [A] 5-15,18-22 [Y] 16,17 | International search | [A]US5328578 (GORDON GARY B [US]); | [A]US5603351 (CHERUKURI SATYAM C [US], et al) |