EP1119590 - SUBSTITUTED PHTHALOCYANINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2001/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLLEB, Annemarie Steinenbühlstrasse 173 CH-4232 Fehren / CH | 02 /
WOLLEB, Heinz Steinenbühlstrasse 173 CH-4232 Fehren / CH | 03 /
DE KEYZER, Gerardus Rebenstrasse 43 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | 04 /
WAGNER, Barbara Wackenroderstrasse 8 D-81739 München / DE | [2001/31] | Application number, filing date | 99969425.0 | 09.09.1999 | [2001/31] | WO1999EP06653 | Priority number, date | CH19980001922 | 21.09.1998 Original published format: CH 192298 | EP19980811238 | 16.12.1998 Original published format: EP 98811238 | CH19980002585 | 29.12.1998 Original published format: CH 258598 | EP19990810107 | 09.02.1999 Original published format: EP 99810107 | [2001/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0017275 | Date: | 30.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119590 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1119590 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09B47/26, G03F7/004, C09D11/00 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
C09D11/32 (EP,US);
C09B47/24 (EP,US);
C09B47/26 (EP,US);
C09D7/41 (EP,US);
G03F7/0007 (EP,US);
G03F7/029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE PHTHALOCYANINE | [2001/31] | English: | SUBSTITUTED PHTHALOCYANINE | [2001/31] | French: | PHTHALOCYANINE SUBSTITUEE | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 19.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 08.01.2003 | GR | 08.01.2003 | IE | 08.01.2003 | DK | 08.04.2003 | PT | 08.04.2003 | AT | 09.09.2003 | CY | 09.09.2003 | LU | 09.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | [2005/11] |
Former [2005/02] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
CY | 09.09.2003 | ||
LU | 09.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
CY | 09.09.2003 | ||
LU | 09.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
CY | 09.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 08.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4000158 (TOBEL HANS VON) [DA] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0519395 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [DA]EP0648817 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1-10 * page 11, line 43 - page 12, line 36 *; | [A]EP0719847 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 7; example - *; | [A]EP0761772 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * page 13, line 1 - line 39 *; | [DA]WO9832802 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * * page 33; example 15 * |