EP1127220 - LIFT VALVE FOR A ROTARY SCREW COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SVENSKA ROTOR MASKINER AB P.O. Box 15085 S-104 65 Stockholm / SE | [2001/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIMUSKA, Karlis Valhallavägen 16 S-114 22 Stockholm / SE | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Wiedemann, Bernd W, et al Svenska Rotor Maskiner AB P.O. Box 15085 104 65 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Wiedemann, Bernd, et al Svenska Rotor Maskiner AB, P.O. Box 15085 104 65 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99969771.7 | 30.04.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999SE00714 | Priority number, date | SE19980003292 | 29.09.1998 Original published format: SE 9803292 | [2001/35] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0019103 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127220 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127220 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/16, F04C29/10 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
F04C28/16 (EP,US);
F04C18/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [2004/15] |
Former [2001/35] | BE, DE, FI, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | REGELVENTIL FÜR EINEN SCHRAUBENKOMPRESSOR | [2001/35] | English: | LIFT VALVE FOR A ROTARY SCREW COMPRESSOR | [2001/35] | French: | SOUPAPE A DISQUE POUR COMPRESSEUR ROTATIF A VIS | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1999 | Translation filed | 08.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 08.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 21.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2323413 (COLTEC IND INC [US]); | [A]US5556271 (ZUERCHER JAN A [US], et al) |