EP1133640 - ROTARY PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KER-TRAIN HOLDINGS LTD. 1687 Jackson Boulevard Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1 / CA | [2006/18] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states KER-TRAIN HOLDINGS LTD. 1687 Jackson Boulevard Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERR, John, Hugh 1687 Jackson Boulevard Kingston, Ontario K7L 4V1 / CA | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/38] | Patentanwälte Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 99970153.5 | 07.10.1999 | [2001/38] | WO1999CA00921 | Priority number, date | US19980103336P | 07.10.1998 Original published format: US 103336 P | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0020760 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133640 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1133640 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/344, F01C1/344, F04B1/04, F04B49/12, F04C14/00 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
F04C14/10 (EP,US);
F04C2/30 (KR);
F01C1/3447 (EP,US);
F04B1/0465 (EP,US);
F04B1/07 (EP,US);
F04B49/128 (EP,US);
F04C2/3447 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/38] | F04C2/344, F01C1/344, F04B1/04, F04B49/12, F04C15/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTATIONSPUMPE | [2001/38] | English: | ROTARY PUMP | [2001/38] | French: | POMPE ROTATIVE | [2001/38] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 29.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 08.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 18.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2006 | FR | 03.05.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/02] | AT | 03.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2359513 (HOWARD EDEN CHARLES, et al) [A] 1,15,23,24 * page 1, line 8 - line 13; figure 4; claim 1 *; | [XAY]US2612110 (DELEGARD CARL J) [X] 1-4,8,9,15,16,20,23-25 * the whole document * [A] 11,22 [Y] 6,10,18,21,27,33; | [Y]US2880677 (GRUPEN JAMES L) [Y] 6,18,27 * figures 1-3; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]US4105377 (MAYALL WILLIAM) [Y] 10,21 * column 2, line 23 - line 49; figure 1 *; | [A]US4157056 (ALLART BERNARD R [FR], et al); | [X]EP0200294 (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,15,16,23 * figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE3541822 (SCHOELL GUENTER) [Y] 33 * figure 3; claims 1,7 *; | [A]US5001964 (ALLART BERNARD [FR], et al); | [X]EP0841485 (HOBOURN AUTOMOTIVE LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,15,16,23 * column 3, line 5 - line 17; figure 1 * |