EP1118187 - METHODS AND ARRANGEMENT FOR ESTABLISHING COMMUNICATION CHANNELS IN A DTM NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Net Insight AB Box 42093 126 14 Stockholm / SE | [2001/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANIELSON, Magnus Kyrkvägen 3A S-182 74 Stocksund / SE | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Henningsson, Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 44 832 21 Frösön / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Henningsson, Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 44 832 21 Frösön / SE | Application number, filing date | 99970231.9 | 01.10.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999SE01749 | Priority number, date | SE19980003351 | 02.10.1998 Original published format: SE 9803351 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0021251 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1118187 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/52, H04J3/16, H04Q11/04 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
H04Q11/04 (EP);
H04L12/52 (KR);
H04Q2213/1302 (EP);
H04Q2213/1304 (EP);
H04Q2213/1305 (EP);
H04Q2213/13174 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ERRICHTUNG VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSKANÄLEN IN EINEM DTM-NETZ | [2001/30] | English: | METHODS AND ARRANGEMENT FOR ESTABLISHING COMMUNICATION CHANNELS IN A DTM NETWORK | [2001/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'ETABLIR DES CANAUX DE COMMUNICATION DANS UN RESEAU A MODE DE TRANSFERT SYNCHRONE DYNAMIQUE | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 30.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 01.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0428407 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]); | [A]EP0462349 (IBM [US]); | [A]GB2267199 (IND TECH RES INST [TW]); | [A]EP0214352 (IBM [US], et al); | [A]US5164938 (JURKEVICH MARK [US], et al) | [A] - CHRISTER BOHM ET. AL., "The DTM Gigabit Network", JOURNAL OF HIGH SPEED NETWORKS, (1994), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 109 - 126, XP000940707 |