EP1143896 - METHODS OF HYDRATING THE NASAL MUCOSAL SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/42] | METHODS OF HYDRATING MUCOSAL SURFACES | ||
[2005/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 308 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4105 Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4105 / US | [2006/50] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill 308 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4105 Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUCHER, Richard, C., Jr. 735 Gimghoul Road Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Harrison Goddard Foote Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99970585.8 | 20.10.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999US24546 | Priority number, date | US19980104999P | 20.10.1998 Original published format: US 104999 P | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023023 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1143896 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143896 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/12 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
A61K31/4965 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/51 (EP,US);
A61K9/0043 (EP,US);
A61P11/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/42] | A61F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Title | German: | METHODEN ZUM BEFEUCHTEN DER NASENSCHLEIMHAUT | [2005/52] | English: | METHODS OF HYDRATING THE NASAL MUCOSAL SURFACE | [2005/52] | French: | METHODES POUR HYDRATER DES MUQUEUSES NASALES | [2006/09] |
Former [2001/42] | METHODEN ZUM BEFEUCHTEN VON SCHLEIMHÄUTEN | ||
Former [2001/42] | METHODS OF HYDRATING MUCOSAL SURFACES | ||
Former [2001/42] | METHODES POUR HYDRATER DES MUQUEUSES | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2006 | CY | 13.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | FI | 13.12.2006 | NL | 13.12.2006 | SE | 13.03.2007 | GR | 14.03.2007 | ES | 24.03.2007 | PT | 14.05.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5635160 (STUTTS III MONROE J [US], et al); | [X]US5656256 (BOUCHER RICHARD C [US], et al); | [XP]US5876700 (BOUCHER JR RICHARD C [US], et al); | [X] - KNOWLES M.R. ET AL., "Activation by extracelular nucleotides of chloride secretion in the airway epithelia of patients with cystic fibrosis", NEW ENG. J. MED.,, (199108), vol. 325, no. 8, pages 533 - 538, XP002922490 |