EP1131338 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PURIFIED INVASIN PROTEIN AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SE | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS CENTER FOR RESEARCH, INC. 2385 Irving Hill Drive Lawrence, KS 66044 / US | For all designated states Walter Reed Army Institute of Research 503 Robert Grant Avenue Silver Spring, MD 20910-7500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS CENTER FOR RESEARCH, INC. 2385 Irving Hill Drive Lawrence, KS 66044 / US | ||
For all designated states Walter Reed Army Institute of Research 503 Robert Grant Avenue Silver Spring, MY 20910-7500 / US | |||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states ST. LOUIS UNIVERSITY 3635 Vista Avenue at Grand Boulevard St. Louis, MO 63110-0250 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PICKING, William, D. 344 Cattleman Trail Lawrence, KS 66045 / US | 02 /
PICKING, Wendy, L. 344 Cattleman Trail Lawrence, KS 66045 / US | 03 /
OAKS, Edwin, V. 3106 Arrowhead Farms Road Gambrills, MD 21054 / US | [2004/30] |
Former [2003/11] | 01 /
PICKING, William, D. 344 Cattlemen Trail Lawrence, KS 66045 / US | ||
02 /
PICKING, Wendy, L. 344 Cattlemen Trail Lawrence, KS 66045 / US | |||
03 /
OAKS, Edwin, V. 3106 Arrowhead Farms Road Gambrills, MD 21054 / US | |||
Former [2001/37] | 01 /
PICKING, William, D. 344 Cattlemen Trail Lawrence, KS 66045 / US | ||
02 /
PICKING, Wendy, D. 344 Cattlemen Trail Lawrence, KS 66045 / US | |||
03 /
OAKS, Edwin, V. 3106 Arrowhead Farms Road Gambrills, MD 21054 / US | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/11] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [2001/37] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99970664.1 | 21.10.1999 | [2001/37] | WO1999US24931 | Priority number, date | US19980105085P | 21.10.1998 Original published format: US 105085 P | US19990136754P | 01.06.1999 Original published format: US 136754 P | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023462 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1131338 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1131338 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/00, A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61K39/02, A61K39/116, A61K45/00, A61K39/085, C07K14/24 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K38/164 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55516 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/37] | C07K1/00, A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61K39/02, A61K39/116, A61K45/00, A61K39/085 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON GEREINIGTEM INVASINPROTEIN UND SEINE ANWENDUNG | [2001/37] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PURIFIED INVASIN PROTEIN AND USE THEREOF | [2001/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PROTEINE INVASINE HAUTEMENT PURIFIEE ET UTILISATION DE CETTE PROTEINE | [2001/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 05.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2005 | BE | 02.03.2005 | CH | 02.03.2005 | FI | 02.03.2005 | IT | 02.03.2005 | LI | 02.03.2005 | NL | 02.03.2005 | DK | 02.06.2005 | GR | 02.06.2005 | SE | 02.06.2005 | DE | 03.06.2005 | ES | 13.06.2005 | PT | 03.08.2005 | CY | 21.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
DE | 03.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
CY | 21.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
DE | 03.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
DE | 03.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X] - CORTHESY ET AL., "A pathogen-specific epitope inserted into recombinant secretory immunoglobulin A is immunogenic by the oral route", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19961227), vol. 271, no. 52, pages 33670 - 33677, XP002923107 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.52.33670 | [X] - PICKING ET AL., "Cloning, expression and affinity purification of recombinant Shigella flexneri invasion plasmid antigens IpaB and IpaC", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (1996), vol. 8, no. 0117, pages 401 - 408, XP002923108 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.1996.0117 | [Y] - MARQUART ET AL., "Soluble invasion plasmid antigen C (IpaC) from Shigella flexneri elicits epithelial cell responses related to pathogen invasion", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (199610), vol. 64, no. 10, pages 4182 - 4187, XP002923109 |