EP1154862 - DEVICE FOR TREATING A GAS/LIQUID MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spark Technologies and Innovations N.V. Kaya W.F.G., (Jombi) Mensing 36 Willemstad Curaçao / AN | For all designated states Koch-Glitsch N.V. Scharlooweg 81 Willemstad Curaçao / AN | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Spark Technologies and Innovations N.V. Kaya W.F.G. (Jombi) Mensing 36 Curaçao / AN | ||
For all designated states Koch-Glitsch N.V. Scharlooweg 81 Curaçao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUYPERS, Cindy, Thérèse, Cornelia Dakarhof 47 NL-2622 CP Delft / NL | 02 /
STANBRIDGE, David, Ian Rembrandtlaan 28 NL-6814 JM Arnhem / NL | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Bruin, Cornelis Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Bruin, Cornelis Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99971355.5 | 04.11.1999 | [2001/47] | WO1999NL00677 | Priority number, date | NL19981010478 | 04.11.1998 Original published format: NL 1010478 | [2001/47] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0025931 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1154862 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154862 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B04C3/00, B04C3/04 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
B04C3/04 (EP,US);
B04C3/00 (EP,US);
B04C3/06 (EP,US);
B04C2003/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/39] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEHANDELN EINER GAS/FLÜSSIGKEITS-MISCHUNG | [2001/47] | English: | DEVICE FOR TREATING A GAS/LIQUID MIXTURE | [2001/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF SERVANT A TRAITER UN MELANGE DE GAZ ET DE LIQUIDE | [2001/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.1999 | Translation filed | 25.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 09.11.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.11.2002 | [2004/10] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4187089 (HODGSON ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 17 - line 41 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0162441 (STEIN INDUSTRIE [FR], et al) [A] 1,7 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 29 * * page 4, line 11 - line 30 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]EP0210910 (AIR IND ENVIRONNEMENT [FR]); | [X]EP0267285 (UK NII PRIRODNYKH GAZOV [SU]) [X] 9,10 * page 5, line 23 - page 7, line 18 * * page 8, line 1 - line 29 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0281630 (UK NII PRIRODNYKH GAZOV [SU]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 28 * * figure - *; | [A]FR2630027 (STEIN INDUSTRIE [FR], et al) [A] 1,7 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 35 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9305339 (VATTENFALL UTVECKLING AB [SE]) [A] 9-11 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2681259 (BERTIN & CIE [FR]) [A] 3,4 * claims 1-3 * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO9749477 (SWANBORN ROMBOUT ADRIAAN [NL]) [A] 1,2,7 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 5 * * figure - * |