EP1046227 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTING AN OPTION IN A SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAIJMAKERS, Jozef, H., M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CORNELISSEN, Michiel, A. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Kopf, Korbinian Paul, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Kopf, Korbinian Paul, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/43] | Gravendeel, Cornelis Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99971595.6 | 22.10.1999 | [2000/43] | WO1999EP08233 | Priority number, date | EP19980203711 | 03.11.1998 Original published format: EP 98203711 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0027030 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1046227 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046227 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03J9/06 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
H03J9/06 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERAFHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTIONENAUSWAHL IN EINEM SYSTEM | [2000/43] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTING AN OPTION IN A SYSTEM | [2000/43] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SELECTIONNER UNE OPTION DANS UN SYSTEME | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 11.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 19.04.2006 | [2007/23] | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4011067 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 24 - line 38 *; | [A]US5008847 (LAPEYRE JAMES M [US]); | [DA]US5157496 (KUROSAWA KAZUYUKI [JP]); | [X]WO9314567 (SIEL ELETTRONICA SPA [IT]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 25 *; | [A]US5327160 (ASHER DAVID J [US]); | [X]US5355307 (SCHARNHORST JOACHIM [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 41 - line 61 * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 10 * |