EP1126805 - MEDICAL INSTRUMENT FOR PHACOEMULSIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Meditec AG Göschwitzer Strasse 51-52 07745 Jena / DE | [2006/43] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states Asclepion-Meditec AG Prüssingstrasse 41 07745 Jena / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELBRECHT, Jens In den Steingelängen 1 D-07751 Jena / DE | 02 /
SCHRÖDER, Eckhard Hans-Sachs-Strasse 9 D-90542 Eckental / DE | 03 /
WEIDNER, Frank Dorfstrasse 20 b D-07751 Löberschütz / DE | [2007/18] |
Former [2001/35] | 01 /
ELBRECHT, Jens Platanenstrasse 6 D-07747 Jena / DE | ||
02 /
SCHRÖDER, Eckhard Hans-Sachs-Strasse 9 D-90542 Eckental / DE | |||
03 /
WEIDNER, Frank Dorfstrasse 20 b D-07751 Löberschütz / DE | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Sellierstrasse 1 07745 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Geyer, Fehners & Partner Patentanwälte Sellierstrasse 1 07745 Jena / DE | ||
Former [2001/35] | Niestroy, Manfred, et al Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner Sellierstrasse 1 07745 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 99971692.1 | 05.11.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999EP08472 | Priority number, date | DE1998152574 | 06.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19852574 | [2001/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0027325 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1126805 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1126805 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/011 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
A61F9/00802 (EP,US);
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B17/320016 (EP,US);
A61B2017/301 (EP,US);
A61F2009/0087 (EP,US);
A61F9/0017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/03] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 28.04.2001 | LT | 28.04.2001 | LV | 28.04.2001 | MK | 28.04.2001 | RO | 28.04.2001 | SI | 28.04.2001 | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES INSTRUMENT ZUR PHACOEMULSIFIKATION | [2001/35] | English: | MEDICAL INSTRUMENT FOR PHACOEMULSIFICATION | [2001/35] | French: | INSTRUMENT MEDICAL POUR PHACO-EMULSIFICATION | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.05.2006 | 16.05.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.01.2007 | DK | 17.01.2007 | FI | 17.01.2007 | IE | 17.01.2007 | IT | 17.01.2007 | NL | 17.01.2007 | SE | 17.04.2007 | GR | 18.04.2007 | ES | 28.04.2007 | PT | 18.06.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/23] | DK | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 17.01.2007 | ||
IT | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | DK | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | DK | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
IE | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
ES | 28.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3844272 (BANKO A) [A] 15-18 * figures 20-22 *; | [YA]US4002169 (CUPLER II JOHN A) [Y] 21,22 * column 9, paragraph 2; figures 6,8 * [A] 15-18; | [XY]DE3822011 (GEUDER HANS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11,13,19 * column 6, paragraph 3 - column 7, paragraph 1; figures 4,5 * * column 5, line 49 - line 57 * [Y] 21,22; | [X]WO9320895 (PREMIER LASER SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,7-10,12 * figure 7 *; | [A]US5257988 (L ESPERANCE JR FRANCIS A [US]) |