EP1124584 - IMPROVED BACTERICIDAL AND NON-BACTERICIDAL SOLUTIONS FOR REMOVING BIOFILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE MONTREAL 2900 Edouard-Montpetit Montréal Québec H3C 3J7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE MONTREAL 2900 Edouard-Montpetit Montréal, Québec H3C 3J7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBEAU, Jean 4582 Euclide Brien Montreal, Quebec H1X 3H4 / CA | 02 /
GRAVEL, Denis 207 des Pyrénées Saint-Lambert, Quebec J4S 1L3 / CA | 03 /
HABI, Abdelkrim Apartment 45 7961 Champ d'Eau Anjou, Quebec H1J 1X4 / CA | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/15] | Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 860 880 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/34] | Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99971720.0 | 08.11.1999 | [2001/34] | WO1999CA01065 | Priority number, date | US19980187249 | 06.11.1998 Original published format: US 187249 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0027438 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1124584 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/18, C11D3/48 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
A61L2/186 (EP,US);
C11D3/042 (EP,US);
C11D3/2082 (EP,US);
C11D3/2086 (EP,US);
C11D3/24 (EP,US);
C11D3/33 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE BAKTERIZIDE UND NICHTBAKTERIZIDE LÖSUNGEN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON BIOFILMEN | [2001/34] | English: | IMPROVED BACTERICIDAL AND NON-BACTERICIDAL SOLUTIONS FOR REMOVING BIOFILMS | [2001/34] | French: | SOLUTIONS BACTERICIDES ET NON BACTERICIDES SERVANT A ELIMINER DES FILMS BIOLOGIQUES | [2001/34] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 31.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/50] | 13.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]JPH1161199 ; | [DA]EP0109279 (SURGIKOS INC [US]) [DA] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9317558 (WHITELEY REGINALD KEITH [AU]) [X] 1-3,13,14,28,30 * claim -; table 1 *; | [A]WO9317723 (SIMMONS PAUL L [US]) [A] 1-6,28-40* claim - *; | [DA]WO9620737 (UNIV MONTREAL [CA], et al) [DA] 1-40 * the whole document * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11061199 A 19990305 (LION CORP) [PX] 1,2,13,28,30 * abstract * |