EP1167603 - STRETCHABLE RASCHEL WARP KNIT FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Yuji 205-51, Nishiyokozeki, Ryuo-cho Gamo-gun, Shiga 520-2571 / JP | 02 /
TANIGUCHI, Yukihito 4-12-13, Moriyama Moriyama-shi, Shiga 524-0022 / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Weber, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2002/01] | Weber, Thomas, Dr., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Deichmannhaus am Dom 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99972271.3 | 16.11.1999 | [2002/01] | WO1999JP06400 | Priority number, date | JP19980325356 | 16.11.1998 Original published format: JP 32535698 | JP19990078941 | 24.03.1999 Original published format: JP 7894199 | [2002/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0029654 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1167603 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D04B21/18, D01F6/62 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
D01F6/62 (EP);
D04B21/12 (EP);
D04B21/18 (EP,KR);
D10B2331/04 (EP);
D10B2501/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DEHNBARE RASCHEL-KETTENSTRICKWARE | [2002/01] | English: | STRETCHABLE RASCHEL WARP KNIT FABRIC | [2002/01] | French: | TISSU TRICOTE A CHAINE RASCHEL EXTENSIBLE | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2001 | Translation filed | 12.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/11] | 12.05.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/19] | 25.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 09.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH0571013 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JPH09296344 (TORAY DU PONT KK); | [A]EP0520162 (WANGNER SYSTEMS CORP [US]); | [A]JPH0978373 (NIPPON ESTER CO LTD) |