EP1071031 - TERMINAL, CHARGING SYSTEM, AND DATA PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YODO, Fumitake Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/04] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99972334.9 | 17.11.1999 | [2001/04] | WO1999JP06424 | Priority number, date | JP19980327019 | 17.11.1998 Original published format: JP 32701998 | [2001/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0029996 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071031 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
G07F7/08 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (KR);
G06Q20/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/085 (EP,US);
G06Q20/14 (KR);
G06Q20/28 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3676 (EP,US);
G06Q20/382 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4037 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0641 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | TERMINAL, LADESYSTEM UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2001/04] | English: | TERMINAL, CHARGING SYSTEM, AND DATA PROCESSING METHOD | [2001/04] | French: | TERMINAL, SYSTEME DE TAXATION ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES | [2001/04] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2000 | Translation filed | 03.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5692132 (HOGAN EDWARD J [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 18 - column 4, line 42 *; | [A]EP0786774 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - line 55 *; | [A]EP0843449 (SUNHAWK CORP INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - column 4, line 25 *; | [A]EP0715244 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line L * | International search | [X]JPH08265189 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [Y]JPH08307558 (XING INC, et al); | [Y]JPH09265731 (SONY CORP) |