EP1051791 - Manufacturing method for a motor vehicle alternator and alternator obtained with the same method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/46] | MOTOR VEHICLE ALTERNATOR WITH INTERPOLAR MAGNETS | ||
[2008/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO EQUIPEMENTS ELECTRIQUES MOTEUR 2, Rue André Boulle 94000 Créteil / FR | [2008/22] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states VALEO EQUIPEMENTS ELECTRIQUES MOTEUR 2, Rue André Boulle 94000 Créteil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARMIROLI, Paul 26, rue des Jachères F-94440 Marolles-en-Brie / FR | 02 /
BADEY, Jean-Philippe 1, rue Gabrielle F-62630 Etaples-sur-mer / FR | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | de Lambilly Delorme, Marie Pierre, et al Valéo Equipements Electriques Moteur Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André-Boulle 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | de Lambilly Delorme, Marie Pierre, et al Valéo Equipements Electriques Moteur Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André-Boulle BP 150 94017 Créteil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/46] | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99973188.8 | 30.11.1999 | [2000/46] | WO1999FR02960 | Priority number, date | FR19980015034 | 30.11.1998 Original published format: FR 9815034 | [2000/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0033440 | Date: | 08.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051791 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1051791 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/22 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
H02K21/044 (EP,US);
H02K7/18 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für einen Wechselstromgenerator für Kraftfahrzeuge mit Zwischenpolmagneten sowie nach diesem Verfahren hergestellter Generator | [2008/01] | English: | Manufacturing method for a motor vehicle alternator and alternator obtained with the same method | [2008/01] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un alternateur à aimants interpolaires et alternateur obtenu selon le procédé | [2008/01] |
Former [2000/46] | WECHSELSTROMGENERATOR FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE MIT ZWISCHENPOL-MAGNETEN | ||
Former [2000/46] | MOTOR VEHICLE ALTERNATOR WITH INTERPOLAR MAGNETS | ||
Former [2000/46] | ALTERNATEUR DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE A AIMANTS INTERPOLAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]JPH07312854 ; | [Y]JPH08317618 ; | [Y]JPS61269650 ; | [X]JPH0998556 ; | [A]JPH04165950 ; | [X]JPH10174394 ; | [A]US3445694 (CAMPBELL ROBERT W, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5306977 (HAYASHI SEIJI [JP]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0834979 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 7; figure - *; | [A]EP0866542 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8-10 * sentence 41 - sentence 45; figure 8 * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 096, no. 003, & JP07312854 A 19951128 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * [A] 7,9 [Y] 5,8 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 097, no. 003, & JP08317618 A 19961129 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 5 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870416), vol. 011, no. 122, Database accession no. (E - 500), & JP61269650 A 19861129 (KENKICHI KUMAKURA;OTHERS: 01) [Y] 8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 097, no. 008, & JP09098556 A 19970408 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920928), vol. 016, no. 465, Database accession no. (E - 1270), & JP04165950 A 19920611 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10174394 A 19980626 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * |