EP1052302 - HIGH STRENGTH COLD ROLLED STEEL PLATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | [2007/07] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | ||
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states NKK CORPORATION 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Takeshi NKK Corporation 1-1-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 02 /
Kitano, Fusato NKK Corporation 1-1-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 03 /
Hosoya, Yoshihiro NKK Corporation 1-1-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 04 /
Inazumi, Toru NKK Corporation 1-1-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 05 /
Yamasaki, Yuji NKK Corporation 1-1-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 06 /
Morita, Masaya NKK Corporation 1-1-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 07 /
Nagataki, Yasunobu NKK Corporation 1-1-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 08 /
Hasegawa, Kohei NKK Corporation 1-1-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 09 /
Matsuda, Hiroshi NKK Corporation 1-1-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 10 /
Ono, Moriaki NKK Corporation 1-1-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2015/02] |
Former [2001/09] | 01 /
Fujita, Takeshi NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
02 /
Kitano, Fusato NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
03 /
Hosoya, Yoshihiro NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
04 /
Inazumi, Toru NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
05 /
Yamasaki, Yuji NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
06 /
Morita, Masaya NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
07 /
Nagataki, Yasunobu NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
08 /
Hasegawa, Kohei NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
09 /
Matsuda, Hiroshi NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
10 /
Ono, Moriaki NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
Former [2000/46] | 01 /
Fujita, Takeshi NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
02 /
Kitano, Fusato NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
03 /
Hosoya, Yoshihiro NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
04 /
Inazumi, Toru NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
05 /
Yamasaki, Yuji NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
06 /
Morita, Masaya NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
07 /
Nagataki, Yasanobu NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
08 /
Hasegawa, Kohei NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
09 /
Matsuda, Hiroshi NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | |||
10 /
Ono, Moriaki NKK Corporation, 1-1-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/02] |
Former [2000/46] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99973310.8 | 03.12.1999 | [2000/46] | WO1999JP06791 | Priority number, date | JP19980346974 | 07.12.1998 Original published format: JP 34697498 | JP19990036283 | 15.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3628399 | JP19990036284 | 15.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3628499 | JP19990036285 | 15.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3628599 | JP19990036286 | 15.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3628699 | JP19990036287 | 15.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3628799 | JP19990036288 | 15.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3628899 | [2000/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0034542 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052302 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052302 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1052302 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/12, C22C38/14, C21D8/02, C21D9/46 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
C22C38/12 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,US);
C21D8/0273 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/004 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | HOCHFESTES, KALTGEWALZTES STAHLBLECH UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2000/46] | English: | HIGH STRENGTH COLD ROLLED STEEL PLATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2000/46] | French: | TOLE D'ACIER HAUTE RESISTANCE LAMINE A FROID ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2000 | Translation filed | 05.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 26.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06002344.7 / EP1669472 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.11.2007
22.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Simons, Johannes Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.11.2007
22.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Simons, Johannes COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.11.2007
22.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Steel AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Simons, Johannes COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.11.2007
ThyssenKrupp Steel AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47161-DUISBURG / DE Opponent's representative Simons, Johannes COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 21.12.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.07.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.08.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.11.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 17.01.2012 | Appeal received No. T0100/12 | 19.03.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.08.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 05.08.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.08.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | NL | 01.07.2014 | [2014/50] |
Former [2014/46] | BE | 31.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63243225 ; | [A]EP0108268 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5* claims 1-6 *; | [X]EP0528407 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [X] 1-5 *Sample I, No.13, Tables 5 and 6*; | [X]EP0816524 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 *page 9, lines 10 to 31*;; examples 18,19,31 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890203), vol. 013, no. 049, Database accession no. (C - 565), & JP63243225 A 19881011 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS62185834 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [Y]JPS63243225 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [A]JPH0641683 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [Y]JPH0748649 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]JPH09235650 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) | Opposition | - K.R. MATTSON ET AL., Mechanical Working and Steel Processing Conference, (1971), pages 348 - 369 | - J. BOUCEK ET AL., "Processing and Properties of ULC Stabilized Steels", MECHANICAL WORKING AND STEEL PROCESSING PROCEEDINGS, (1989), pages 533 - 546 | - E.J. DREWES ET AL., "Hochfeste warm- und kaltgewalzte Stahlbleche für den Automobilbau- Verarbeitungseigenschaften und Funktionsverhalten", STAHL U. EISEN, (1984), vol. 104, no. 25-26, pages 39 - 44 |