EP1164338 - HEAT PUMP SYSTEM OF COMBINATION OF AMMONIA CYCLE AND CARBON DIOXIDE CYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Opposition rejected | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hachiyo Engineering Co., Ltd. Suzuki Building, 2-13, Nakaminato 2-chome Yaizu-shi Shizuoka 425-0021 / JP | [2006/02] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Hachiyo Engineering Co., Ltd. Suzuki Building, 2-13, Nakaminato 2-chome Yaizu-shi, Shizuoka 425-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEO, Hidetoshi 2-24-704, Ekikita 1-Chome Yaizu-Shi, Shizuoka 425-0028 / JP | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Hague, Alison Jane, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Hague, Alison Jane, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99973718.2 | 30.09.1999 | [2001/51] | WO1999JP05368 | Priority number, date | JP19990046559 | 24.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4655999 | JP19990167429 | 14.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16742999 | [2001/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0050822 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1164338 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1164338 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00, F25B7/00, F25B25/00 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
F25B25/005 (EP,US);
F25B23/006 (EP,US);
F25B2309/06 (EP,US);
F25B2400/22 (EP,US);
F25B9/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/51] | F25B1/00, F25B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Title | German: | EINEN AMMONIAKKREISLAUF UND EINEN KOHLENDIOXIDKREISLAUF KOMBINIERENDE WÄRMEPUMPE | [2001/51] | English: | HEAT PUMP SYSTEM OF COMBINATION OF AMMONIA CYCLE AND CARBON DIOXIDE CYCLE | [2001/51] | French: | SYSTEME DE POMPE A CHALEUR COMBINANT UN CYCLE AMMONIAC AVEC UN CYCLE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2001 | Translation filed | 19.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 08.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2006
19.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Mayekawa Mfg. Co., Ltd. 13-1, Botan 2-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0046 / JP Opponent's representative Buchetmann, Dominik Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2006
19.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Mayekawa Mfg. Co., Ltd. 13-1, Botan 2-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0046 / JP Opponent's representative Buchetmann, Dominik Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | 15.11.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.05.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.12.2008 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2009/25] | 18.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.01.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Request for further processing for: | 04.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 04.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2006 | BE | 11.01.2006 | CY | 11.01.2006 | FI | 11.01.2006 | NL | 11.01.2006 | DK | 11.04.2006 | GR | 12.04.2006 | PT | 12.06.2006 | LU | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | IE | 02.10.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
BE | 11.01.2006 | ||
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
GR | 12.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
LU | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
IE | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
BE | 11.01.2006 | ||
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
GR | 12.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
IE | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
BE | 11.01.2006 | ||
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
IE | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
BE | 11.01.2006 | ||
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 11.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4315924 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM FUER KAELTET [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 40 - line 64; figure 1 * * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [X]US5400615 (PEARSON STEPHEN F [GB]) [X] 1,4,5* the whole document *; | [XY]EP0675331 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,3-5 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 54; figures 1,5; claims 1,9,13 * * column 14, line 39 - column 15, line 17 * * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [Y]US5507158 (BERNIER JACQUES [FR]) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 28 - line 32; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS6438558 (TAKENAKA KOMUTEN CO, et al); | [Y]JPH1123079 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) |