EP1147669 - Video signal processing method and apparatus by feature points extraction in the compressed domain. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/43] | VIDEO/AUDIO SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD AND VIDEO/AUDIO SIGNAL PROCESSING APPARATUS | ||
[2006/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuhn, M. Peter Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Pratt, Richard Wilson D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99974241.4 | 29.11.1999 | [2001/43] | WO1999JP06664 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0141451 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1147669 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1147669 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/36, G06F17/30 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
G06T7/20 (EP,US);
H04N21/43 (KR);
G06V20/40 (EP,US);
G06F16/739 (EP,US);
G06F16/745 (EP,US);
G06F16/786 (EP,US);
G06F16/7864 (EP,US);
H04N19/14 (EP,US);
H04N19/48 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (KR);
H04N19/513 (EP,US);
H04N19/527 (EP,US);
H04N19/54 (EP,US);
H04N19/547 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US);
H04N19/87 (EP,US);
H04N19/90 (EP,US);
H04N23/6811 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung von Videosignalen durch Charakteristischen Punkten Extraktion im komprimierten Bereich. | [2006/21] | English: | Video signal processing method and apparatus by feature points extraction in the compressed domain. | [2006/21] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de traitement de signal vidéo par extraction de points caractéristiques dans le domaine compressé. | [2006/21] |
Former [2001/43] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEARBEITUNG VON VIDEO-AUDIOSIGNALEN | ||
Former [2001/43] | VIDEO/AUDIO SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD AND VIDEO/AUDIO SIGNAL PROCESSING APPARATUS | ||
Former [2001/43] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL AUDIO-VIDEO | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06076495.8 / EP1752891 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5708767 (YEO BOON-LOCK [US], et al) [A] 53-56 * abstract ** figures 1,11,12 *; | [YA]US5760846 (LEE MIN-SUP [KR]) [Y] 81-92 * abstract * * column 5, line 39 - line 48 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 37 * * figure 3 * [A] 1-80; | [YA]WO9852356 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [Y] 53-56 * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 28 * * page 11, line 8 - line 25 * * page 14, line 4 - line 8 * [A] 1-52,57-92; | [A]US5936671 (VAN BEEK PETRUS J L [US], et al) [A] 1-92 * abstract * * column 8, line 25 - line 49 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US5946041 (MORITA TOSHIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-92 * abstract * * figures 2,9 * * claim 1 *; | [YA] - KOC U -V ET AL, "DCT-BASED MOTION ESTIMATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19980701), vol. 7, no. 7, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 948 - 965, XP000766009 [Y] 81-92 * abstract * * figure 8 * [A] 1-80 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/83.701146 | [A] - MERHAV N ET AL, "FAST ALGORITHMS FOR DCT-DOMAIN IMAGE DOWN-SAMPLING AND FOR INVERSE MOTION COMPENSATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19970601), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 468 - 476, XP000690585 [A] 1-92 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.585926 | [Y] - ZHONG D ET AL, "CLUSTERING METHODS FOR VIDEO BROWSING AND ANNOTATION", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE,US,BELLINGHAM, SPIE, (19960201), vol. 2670, ISBN 0-8194-2044-1, pages 239 - 246, XP000642573 [Y] 53-56 * the whole document * |